Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 775 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4943 Week
» 20057 Month
» 323247 Year
» 1544812 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 915 m/e 09/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1415   02/11/1946
British Railways 61415   14/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1920 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off Neville Hill (55H)
Scrapping During 03/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 41 yrs , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 8/II/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) m/e 09/1920
SEL Selby m/e 05/1923
DAR Darlington on 19/03/1924
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
DAR Darlington on 29/09/1946
YK York (North) on 27/07/1947
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
52B Heaton on 25/09/1955
50B Neville Hill on 10/06/1956
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YK York (North) on 27/07/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 23/06/1956
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1125)
22/03/1928 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1138)
19/05/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1472)
20/03/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2881)
29/04/1940 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3038)
17/12/1942 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3276)
06/04/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3055)
14/07/1949 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3955)
02/04/1955 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24065)
07/01/1958 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24016)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 30/05/1923 10/08/1923 73 days General  
Gateshead Works 17/12/1926 25/03/1927 99 days General  
Darlington Works 16/02/1928 22/03/1928 36 days General
Boiler number D1138 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 24/06/1930 17/09/1930 86 days General  
Darlington Works 26/06/1931 13/07/1931 18 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/04/1933 19/05/1933 39 days General
Boiler number D1472 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 24/06/1935 13/09/1935 82 days General  
Darlington Works 02/03/1936 09/04/1936 39 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Darlington Works 18/12/1936 20/03/1937 93 days General
Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 23/03/1937 24/03/1937 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/04/1937 03/05/1937 32 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/08/1937 25/08/1937 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 10/12/1937 31/12/1937 22 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 04/01/1938 27/01/1938 24 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 28/09/1938 04/10/1938 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/05/1939 08/09/1939 131 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 01/04/1940 29/04/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 29/08/1941 03/09/1941 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/11/1942 17/12/1942 37 days General
Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 26/09/1944 20/10/1944 25 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/03/1946 06/04/1946 30 days General
Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 23/10/1946 06/12/1946 45 days Light Repair
After collision
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1415
 
Gateshead Works 03/10/1947 23/10/1947 21 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 29/11/1947 17/12/1947 19 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Darlington Works 14/06/1949 14/07/1949 31 days General
Boiler number 24069 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61415
 
Darlington Works 28/08/1952 20/09/1952 24 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 22/09/1952 25/09/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/03/1955 02/04/1955 25 days General
Boiler number 24065 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 04/04/1955 07/04/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/04/1955 13/05/1955 23 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/11/1956 04/12/1956 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/12/1957 07/01/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 24016 (Diagram 49)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Darlington Works New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907
08/10/1955 North Eastern Miscellany Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. SLS/195512

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 915
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
05/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
30/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1923. Dep: 10/08/1923.    
19/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
17/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1926. Dep: 25/03/1927.    
16/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1928. Dep: 22/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1138 (Diagram 49)
   
24/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1930. Dep: 17/09/1930.    
26/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1931. Dep: 13/07/1931.    
11/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1933. Dep: 19/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1472 (Diagram 49)
   
24/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1935. Dep: 13/09/1935.    
02/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/03/1936. Dep: 09/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
18/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1936. Dep: 20/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49)
   
23/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1937. Dep: 24/03/1937.    
02/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1937. Dep: 03/05/1937.    
25/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 25/08/1937. Dep: 25/08/1937.    
10/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937.    
04/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1938. Dep: 27/01/1938.    
28/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/09/1938. Dep: 04/10/1938.    
01/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/05/1939. Dep: 08/09/1939.    
01/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1940. Dep: 29/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 49A)
   
29/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/08/1941. Dep: 03/09/1941.    
11/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1942. Dep: 17/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 49A)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
26/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/09/1944. Dep: 20/10/1944.    
08/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A)
   
29/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
23/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1946. Dep: 06/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1415
   
27/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
03/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1947. Dep: 23/10/1947.    
29/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1947. Dep: 17/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
14/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1949. Dep: 14/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24069 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61415
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
28/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952.    
22/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 25/09/1952.    
09/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24065 (Diagram 49)
   
04/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955.    
21/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/04/1955. Dep: 13/05/1955.    
25/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
10/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
29/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/11/1956. Dep: 04/12/1956.    
03/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1957. Dep: 07/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24016 (Diagram 49)
   
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61415 from Neville Hill (55H)    

prev prev