Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 158 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6547 Week
» 26989 Month
» 363835 Year
» 1585400 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 920 m/e 09/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1416   09/12/1946
British Railways 61416   01/07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1920 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Fri 12/05/1961 off Mirfield (56D)
Scrapping During 05/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 40 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 12/5/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) m/e 09/1920
YK York (North) on 29/06/1936
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
YK York (North) on 04/12/1949
50B Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50A York (North) on 21/10/1951
56D Mirfield on 11/12/1960
   Withdrawn on 12/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) w/e 27/10/1951
ALLOC 56D Mirfield on 17/12/1960
WDN   on 12/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1133)
04/10/1928 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1559)
16/09/1931 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1491)
21/04/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1583)
08/02/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2266)
21/03/1944 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1622)
25/01/1947 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2883)
01/07/1950 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2877)
18/06/1956 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24078)
19/09/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24024)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 08/04/1924 17/07/1924 101 days General  
Gateshead Works 27/07/1928 04/10/1928 70 days General
Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 31/07/1931 16/09/1931 48 days General
Boiler number D1491 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 23/09/1932 03/10/1932 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/03/1934 21/04/1934 47 days General
Boiler number D1583 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 20/02/1936 18/04/1936 59 days General  
Darlington Works 11/11/1936 01/12/1936 21 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/08/1937 08/10/1937 54 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 20/07/1938 02/09/1938 45 days General  
Darlington Works 05/09/1938 19/09/1938 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/01/1941 08/02/1941 37 days General
Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 25/02/1944 21/03/1944 26 days General
Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 02/10/1945 19/10/1945 18 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/12/1946 25/01/1947 44 days General
Boiler number 2883 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 05/06/1950 01/07/1950 27 days General
Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 61416
 
Darlington Works 03/07/1950 06/07/1950 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/04/1953 23/05/1953 30 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 25/05/1953 30/05/1953 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/05/1956 18/06/1956 34 days General
Boiler number 24078 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 25/06/1956 29/06/1956 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/08/1959 18/09/1959 33 days General  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/01/1948 Rossington 'A.3' No. 63 Isinglass was hauling the northbound empty wagon train which became partly derailed just south of Rossington on 17/1. The breakdown vans were worked out from Doncaster by 'B.16' No. 1416 SLS/194803
17/12/1960 Mirfield MPD From 17th Dec., six B16s have been allocated for freight duties, viz.' 61411-4/6/47;, during 1959, several were on loan to this shed while the 4 Mirfield B1s were in shops. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 920
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
08/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1924. Dep: 17/07/1924.    
27/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1928. Dep: 04/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49)
   
31/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1931. Dep: 16/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1491 (Diagram 49)
   
23/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1932. Dep: 03/10/1932.    
06/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1583 (Diagram 49)
   
20/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1936. Dep: 18/04/1936.    
29/06/1936 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
11/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1936. Dep: 01/12/1936.    
16/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/08/1937. Dep: 08/10/1937.    
20/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1938. Dep: 02/09/1938.    
05/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/09/1938. Dep: 19/09/1938.    
03/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49)
   
25/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1944. Dep: 21/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49)
   
02/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1945. Dep: 19/10/1945.    
09/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1416    
13/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2883 (Diagram 49)
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
05/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1950. Dep: 01/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 61416
   
03/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1950. Dep: 06/07/1950.    
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
21/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
24/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1953. Dep: 23/05/1953.    
25/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953.    
16/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1956. Dep: 18/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24078 (Diagram 49)
   
25/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1956. Dep: 29/06/1956.    
17/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1959. Dep: 18/09/1959.    
19/09/1959 Modification Diagram 49A number 24024 boiler fitted    
19/09/1959 Modification Diagram 49A number 3055 boiler fitted    
11/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
12/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61416 from Mirfield (56D)    

prev prev