Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 1230 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7619 Week
» 28061 Month
» 364907 Year
» 1586472 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 921 m/e 10/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1417   27/10/1946
British Railways 61417 on 22/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/110/1920
B16/307/12/1945
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1920 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 03/09/1962 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 41 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 11/9/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) m/e 10/1920
TWD Tweedmouth on 11/06/1928
YK York (North) on 22/07/1929
TWD Tweedmouth on 28/10/1931
YK York (North) on 16/10/1934
   Withdrawn on 03/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 03/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1138)
14/03/1928 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1179)
19/12/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D962)
28/09/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1614)
14/05/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2558)
10/01/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1434)
12/10/1942 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1510)
07/12/1945 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3579)
02/01/1948 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3578)
22/12/1950 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24011)
21/03/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 2407])
23/04/1955 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24055)
20/06/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24044)
23/10/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24053)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 03/01/1924 14/03/1924 72 days General  
Darlington Works 20/06/1924 15/07/1924 26 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 28/09/1925 30/10/1925 33 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 18/02/1926 08/03/1926 19 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 02/12/1927 14/03/1928 104 days General
Boiler number D1179 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 13/08/1929 28/08/1929 16 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 04/11/1930 19/12/1930 46 days General
Boiler number D962 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 08/03/1932 16/03/1932 9 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 23/08/1933 28/09/1933 37 days General
Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/02/1935 06/04/1935 57 days General  
Darlington Works 08/04/1935 26/04/1935 19 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/04/1937 14/05/1937 31 days General
Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 19/05/1937 27/05/1937 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/11/1939 10/01/1940 43 days General
Boiler number D1434 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 25/01/1941 05/02/1941 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/09/1942 12/10/1942 28 days General
Boiler number D1510 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 23/10/1944 13/11/1944 22 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 16/11/1945 07/12/1945 22 days General
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3579 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 27/11/1947 02/01/1948 37 days General
Boiler number 3578 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 27/11/1950 22/12/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 24011 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61417
 
Darlington Works 19/02/1953 21/03/1953 31 days General
Boiler number 2407] (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 29/03/1955 23/04/1955 26 days General
Boiler number 24055 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 25/04/1955 26/04/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/05/1957 20/06/1957 32 days General
Boiler number 24044 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 23/09/1959 23/10/1959 31 days General
Boiler number 24053 (Diagram 49A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 921
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
03/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1924. Dep: 14/03/1924.    
20/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1924. Dep: 15/07/1924.    
28/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1925. Dep: 30/10/1925.    
18/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/02/1926. Dep: 08/03/1926.    
02/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1927. Dep: 14/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1179 (Diagram 49)
   
11/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)    
22/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
13/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1929. Dep: 28/08/1929.    
04/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1930. Dep: 19/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D962 (Diagram 49)
   
28/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)    
08/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1932. Dep: 16/03/1932.    
23/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1933. Dep: 28/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49)
   
16/10/1934 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
09/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935.    
08/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/04/1935. Dep: 26/04/1935.    
14/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1937. Dep: 14/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49)
   
19/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1937. Dep: 27/05/1937.    
29/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1939. Dep: 10/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1434 (Diagram 49)
   
25/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 05/02/1941.    
15/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1942. Dep: 12/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1510 (Diagram 49)
   
23/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1944. Dep: 13/11/1944.    
16/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1945. Dep: 07/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3579 (Diagram 49A)
   
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1417    
27/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1947. Dep: 02/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3578 (Diagram 49A)
   
27/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1950. Dep: 22/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24011 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61417
   
19/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2407] (Diagram 49A)
   
29/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24055 (Diagram 49A)
   
25/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 26/04/1955.    
20/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 20/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24044 (Diagram 49A)
   
23/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1959. Dep: 23/10/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24053 (Diagram 49A)
   
03/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61417 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev