|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 05/09/1923 | 22/11/1923 | 79 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 31/08/1926 | 18/01/1927 | 141 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/05/1929 | 14/08/1929 | 92 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/09/1931 | 22/10/1931 | 39 days | Heavy | Boiler number D1188 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1932 | 22/12/1932 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1935 | 11/09/1935 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2692 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1938 | 24/06/1938 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1940 | 19/09/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1943 | 01/04/1944 | 361 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3433 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1944 | 26/07/1944 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1944 | 10/08/1944 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/04/1945 | 07/05/1945 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1946 | 15/06/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3498 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 23/06/1947 | 25/06/1947 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1948 | 27/08/1948 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61418 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1948 | 16/09/1948 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1949 | 10/03/1949 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1949 | 13/01/1950 | 24 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1951 | 24/11/1951 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24037 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1951 | 27/11/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1954 | 17/03/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1956 | 05/06/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1958 | 14/08/1958 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1960 | 25/10/1960 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1961 | 10/10/1961 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24109 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1961 | 30/10/1961 | 11 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1954 | Darlington Works | North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. | SLS/195404 |
26/08/1961 | York South | York south shed is now used for storage only-on 26th August the following were noted-47239/48, 61418/9/44/67, 68677/87, 69003/8/16. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 922 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
05/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1923. Dep: 22/11/1923. | ||
01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
31/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1926. Dep: 18/01/1927. | ||
15/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1929. Dep: 14/08/1929. | ||
14/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/09/1931. Dep: 22/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1188 (Diagram 49) |
||
08/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1932. Dep: 22/12/1932. | ||
08/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1935. Dep: 11/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2692 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
11/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1938. Dep: 24/06/1938. | ||
27/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/06/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. | ||
01/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
15/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1940. Dep: 19/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1943. Dep: 01/04/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3433 (Diagram 49A) |
||
13/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/07/1944. Dep: 26/07/1944. | ||
09/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1944. Dep: 10/08/1944. | ||
20/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1945. Dep: 07/05/1945. | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3498 (Diagram 49A) |
||
04/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1418 | ||
23/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1947. Dep: 25/06/1947. | ||
07/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1948. Dep: 27/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61418 |
||
06/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1948. Dep: 16/09/1948. | ||
23/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/02/1949. Dep: 10/03/1949. | ||
21/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1949. Dep: 13/01/1950. | ||
01/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24037 (Diagram 49A) |
||
26/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 27/11/1951. | ||
17/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 17/03/1954. | ||
01/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1956. Dep: 05/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A) |
||
27/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1958. Dep: 14/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/10/1960. Dep: 25/10/1960. | ||
12/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 10/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24109 (Diagram 49A) |
||
20/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1961. Dep: 30/10/1961. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61418 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
12/10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |