Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 202 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 202 Week
» 22708 Month
» 325898 Year
» 1547463 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 922 m/e 11/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1418   04/12/1946
British Railways 61418   27/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/111/1920
B16/301/04/1944
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1920 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 29/06/1964 off Hull Dairycoates (50B)
Scrapping Mon 12/10/1964 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 43 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A. Draper, Hull, 9/64. Cut up 12/10/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) m/e 11/1920
TDK Tyne Dock m/e 01/1925
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 29/12/1936
YK York (North) on 01/06/1940
50B Hull Dairycoates on 02/12/1962
   Withdrawn on 29/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/12/1962
WDN   on 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1141)
22/10/1931 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1188)
11/09/1935 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2692)
19/09/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1525)
01/04/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3433)
15/06/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3498)
27/08/1948 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3049)
24/11/1951 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24037)
13/03/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24029)
05/06/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24017)
14/08/1958 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24009)
10/10/1961 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24109)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 05/09/1923 22/11/1923 79 days General  
Gateshead Works 31/08/1926 18/01/1927 141 days General  
Gateshead Works 15/05/1929 14/08/1929 92 days General  
Gateshead Works 14/09/1931 22/10/1931 39 days Heavy
Boiler number D1188 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 08/11/1932 22/12/1932 45 days General  
Darlington Works 08/08/1935 11/09/1935 35 days General
Boiler number 2692 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 11/05/1938 24/06/1938 45 days General  
Darlington Works 27/06/1938 09/07/1938 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/08/1940 19/09/1940 36 days General
Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 07/04/1943 01/04/1944 361 days General
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3433 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 13/07/1944 26/07/1944 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/08/1944 10/08/1944 2 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 20/04/1945 07/05/1945 18 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 11/05/1946 15/06/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 3498 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 23/06/1947 25/06/1947 3 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 07/07/1948 27/08/1948 52 days General
Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61418
 
Darlington Works 06/09/1948 16/09/1948 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/02/1949 10/03/1949 16 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 21/12/1949 13/01/1950 24 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 01/11/1951 24/11/1951 24 days General
Boiler number 24037 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 26/11/1951 27/11/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/02/1954 13/03/1954 25 days General
Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 15/03/1954 17/03/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/05/1956 05/06/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 27/06/1958 14/08/1958 49 days General
Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 10/10/1960 25/10/1960 16 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 12/09/1961 10/10/1961 29 days General
Boiler number 24109 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 20/10/1961 30/10/1961 11 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1954 Darlington Works North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. SLS/195404
26/08/1961 York South York south shed is now used for storage only-on 26th August the following were noted-47239/48, 61418/9/44/67, 68677/87, 69003/8/16. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 922
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
05/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1923. Dep: 22/11/1923.    
01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
31/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1926. Dep: 18/01/1927.    
15/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1929. Dep: 14/08/1929.    
14/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/09/1931. Dep: 22/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1188 (Diagram 49)
   
08/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1932. Dep: 22/12/1932.    
08/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1935. Dep: 11/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2692 (Diagram 49)
   
29/12/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
11/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1938. Dep: 24/06/1938.    
27/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/06/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938.    
01/06/1940 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
15/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1940. Dep: 19/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49)
   
07/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1943. Dep: 01/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3433 (Diagram 49A)
   
13/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/07/1944. Dep: 26/07/1944.    
09/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1944. Dep: 10/08/1944.    
20/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1945. Dep: 07/05/1945.    
11/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3498 (Diagram 49A)
   
04/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1418    
23/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1947. Dep: 25/06/1947.    
07/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1948. Dep: 27/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61418
   
06/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1948. Dep: 16/09/1948.    
23/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/02/1949. Dep: 10/03/1949.    
21/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1949. Dep: 13/01/1950.    
01/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24037 (Diagram 49A)
   
26/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 27/11/1951.    
17/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A)
   
15/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 17/03/1954.    
01/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1956. Dep: 05/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A)
   
27/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1958. Dep: 14/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A)
   
10/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/10/1960. Dep: 25/10/1960.    
12/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 10/10/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24109 (Diagram 49A)
   
20/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1961. Dep: 30/10/1961.    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
29/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61418 from Hull Dairycoates (50B)    

prev prev