|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/03/1923 | 13/06/1923 | 85 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1925 | 24/03/1926 | 107 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1927 | 27/09/1927 | 135 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1929 | 12/09/1929 | 99 days | General | Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1929 | 25/09/1929 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1930 | 18/01/1930 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1932 | 18/05/1932 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1935 | 24/01/1936 | 46 days | General | Boiler number D1172 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1937 | 24/02/1938 | 78 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1939 | 02/05/1939 | 62 days | General | Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1940 | 29/07/1940 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1940 | 14/12/1940 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1941 | 22/03/1941 | 47 days | Heavy | Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1942 | 11/09/1942 | 68 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1944 | 05/02/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1947 | 12/07/1947 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3448 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1951 | 22/09/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61419 |
||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1951 | 25/09/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1954 | 25/09/1954 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1954 | 28/09/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1957 | 11/05/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24043 (Diagram 49) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1951 | Locomotives still not renumbered | Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). | SLS/195108 |
26/08/1961 | York South | York south shed is now used for storage only-on 26th August the following were noted-47239/48, 61418/9/44/67, 68677/87, 69003/8/16. | SLS/196110 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 923 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
21/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1923. Dep: 13/06/1923. | ||
08/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1925. Dep: 24/03/1926. | ||
16/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1927. Dep: 27/09/1927. | ||
14/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
06/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1929. Dep: 12/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1929. Dep: 25/09/1929. | ||
03/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
08/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/01/1930. Dep: 18/01/1930. | ||
11/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1932. Dep: 18/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49) |
||
10/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1935. Dep: 24/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1172 (Diagram 49) |
||
09/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/12/1937. Dep: 24/02/1938. | ||
02/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1939. Dep: 02/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49) |
||
03/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/07/1940. Dep: 29/07/1940. | ||
27/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940. | ||
04/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49) |
||
06/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1942. Dep: 11/09/1942. | ||
13/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49) |
||
13/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1419 | ||
13/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1947. Dep: 12/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3448 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
28/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61419 |
||
24/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1951. Dep: 25/09/1951. | ||
17/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1954. Dep: 25/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A) |
||
27/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 28/09/1954. | ||
16/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1957. Dep: 11/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24043 (Diagram 49) |
||
30/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61419 from York (North) (50A) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |