Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 598 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 598 Week
» 30096 Month
» 366942 Year
» 1588507 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 928 m/e 01/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1423   17/11/1946
British Railways (Interim) E1423   30/01/1948
British Railways 61423   09/04/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1921 to Tweedmouth (TWD)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 11/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 40 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 1/11/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TWD Tweedmouth (New) m/e 01/1921
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 01/08/1929
NEV Neville Hill on 06/03/1940
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
YK York (North) on 04/12/1949
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
WDN   m/e 31/01/1959
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1921 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1184)
21/04/1927 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1048)
10/10/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1442)
14/10/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1566)
07/03/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1214)
24/03/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2268)
04/03/1942 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3027)
05/06/1945 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3261)
30/01/1948 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3051)
09/04/1952 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24054)
23/10/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24020)
04/10/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24064)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 26/03/1924 17/06/1924 84 days General  
Gateshead Works 17/01/1927 21/04/1927 95 days General
Boiler number D1048 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 04/08/1927 08/08/1927 5 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 25/04/1928 24/05/1928 30 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 15/05/1929 22/05/1929 8 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 08/08/1929 08/11/1929 93 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 12/08/1930 10/10/1930 60 days General
Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 31/08/1932 14/10/1932 45 days General
Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 17/12/1935 07/03/1936 82 days General
Boiler number D1214 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/02/1939 24/03/1939 44 days General
Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 29/03/1939 24/04/1939 27 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/05/1941 17/06/1941 40 days General  
Darlington Works 29/01/1942 04/03/1942 35 days General
Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 20/01/1943 03/02/1943 15 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 23/03/1945 05/06/1945 75 days General
Boiler number 240]2 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 01/08/1945 02/08/1945 2 days Light Repair
Water scoop refitted
 
Gateshead Works 29/06/1946 05/07/1946 7 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 18/12/1947 30/01/1948 44 days General
Boiler number 3051 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1423
 
Darlington Works 19/03/1952 09/04/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 24054 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61423
 
Darlington Works 27/09/1954 23/10/1954 27 days General
Boiler number 24020 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 25/10/1954 28/10/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/12/1955 22/12/1955 17 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 06/09/1957 04/10/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 24064 (Diagram 49A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1951 Locomotives still not renumbered Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). SLS/195108
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1921 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 928
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
26/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1924. Dep: 17/06/1924.    
17/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1927. Dep: 21/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1048 (Diagram 49)
   
04/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/08/1927. Dep: 08/08/1927.    
25/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1928. Dep: 24/05/1928.    
15/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1929. Dep: 22/05/1929.    
01/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
08/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1929. Dep: 08/11/1929.    
12/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1930. Dep: 10/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49)
   
31/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1932. Dep: 14/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49)
   
17/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1935. Dep: 07/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1214 (Diagram 49)
   
09/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1939. Dep: 24/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49)
   
29/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/03/1939. Dep: 24/04/1939.    
06/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
09/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1941. Dep: 17/06/1941.    
29/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1942. Dep: 04/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 49A)
   
20/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1943. Dep: 03/02/1943.    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
23/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1945. Dep: 05/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 240]2 (Diagram 49A)
   
01/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/08/1945. Dep: 02/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Water scoop refitted
   
29/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/06/1946. Dep: 05/07/1946.    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1423    
18/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1947. Dep: 30/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3051 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1423
   
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
19/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1952. Dep: 09/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24054 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61423
   
27/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 23/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24020 (Diagram 49A)
   
25/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/10/1954. Dep: 28/10/1954.    
06/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1955. Dep: 22/12/1955.    
06/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1957. Dep: 04/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24064 (Diagram 49A)
   
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61423 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev