Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 1026 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7416 Week
» 36914 Month
» 373760 Year
» 1595325 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 929 m/e 02/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1424   01/12/1946
British Railways 61424   21/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1921 to Neville Hill (NEV)
Withdrawal Wed 05/10/1960 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 10/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 39 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 5/10/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEV Neville Hill (New) m/e 02/1921
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
50B Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50A York (North) on 15/11/1953
50B Neville Hill on 14/03/1954
50A York (North) on 18/07/1954
   Withdrawn on 05/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 14/08/1954
WDN   on 05/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1921 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1186)
23/02/1931 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1229)
29/10/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1036)
16/08/1938 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1188)
08/03/1941 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3167)
30/08/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3500)
21/09/1949 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3055)
27/06/1952 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24065)
11/12/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24031)
05/06/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24022)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 21/12/1923 06/03/1924 77 days General  
Darlington Works 05/04/1927 28/10/1927 207 days General  
Darlington Works 06/01/1931 23/02/1931 49 days General
Boiler number D1229 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 27/09/1934 29/10/1934 33 days General
Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 31/08/1936 13/11/1936 75 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 22/06/1938 16/08/1938 56 days General
Boiler number D1188 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 27/01/1941 08/03/1941 41 days General
Boiler number 3167 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 31/08/1943 21/10/1943 52 days General  
Darlington Works 10/10/1944 02/11/1944 24 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 07/05/1945 26/05/1945 20 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 12/07/1946 30/08/1946 50 days General
Boiler number 3500 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 21/10/1947 13/11/1947 24 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 26/08/1949 21/09/1949 27 days General
Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61424
 
Darlington Works 28/09/1949 12/10/1949 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/05/1951 06/06/1951 21 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 03/06/1952 27/06/1952 25 days General
Boiler number 24065 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 20/03/1954 06/05/1954 48 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 10/11/1954 11/12/1954 32 days General
Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 13/12/1954 14/12/1954 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/05/1957 05/06/1957 28 days General
Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 11/06/1957 13/06/1957 3 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1921 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 929
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
21/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1923. Dep: 06/03/1924.    
05/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1927. Dep: 28/10/1927.    
06/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1931. Dep: 23/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1229 (Diagram 49)
   
27/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1934. Dep: 29/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49)
   
31/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/08/1936. Dep: 13/11/1936.    
22/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1938. Dep: 16/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1188 (Diagram 49)
   
27/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1941. Dep: 08/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3167 (Diagram 49A)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
31/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1943. Dep: 21/10/1943.    
10/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/10/1944. Dep: 02/11/1944.    
07/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/05/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945.    
12/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1946. Dep: 30/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3500 (Diagram 49A)
   
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1424    
21/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1947. Dep: 13/11/1947.    
26/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1949. Dep: 21/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61424
   
28/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/09/1949. Dep: 12/10/1949.    
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
17/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1951. Dep: 06/06/1951.    
03/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1952. Dep: 27/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24065 (Diagram 49)
   
15/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
14/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
20/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1954. Dep: 06/05/1954.    
18/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
10/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A)
   
13/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1954. Dep: 14/12/1954.    
09/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1957. Dep: 05/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A)
   
11/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1957. Dep: 13/06/1957.    
05/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61424 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev