Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 141 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 141 Week
» 22647 Month
» 325837 Year
» 1547402 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 930 m/e 02/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1425   18/12/1946
British Railways 61425   26/05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1921 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 11/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 40 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 30/10/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) m/e 02/1921
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 30/03/1931
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
NEV Neville Hill on 28/08/1949
50A York (North) on 14/02/1960
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 03/09/1949
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1921 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1188)
29/04/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1243)
11/08/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1610)
08/06/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2778)
11/10/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2560)
06/01/1945 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1556)
06/09/1947 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2778)
26/05/1951 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24022)
05/06/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24038)
17/08/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24028)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 15/09/1924 25/11/1924 72 days General  
Gateshead Works 26/05/1926 16/06/1926 22 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 25/08/1927 09/12/1927 107 days General  
Darlington Works 30/07/1929 15/08/1929 17 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 04/11/1929 22/11/1929 19 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 13/03/1930 29/04/1930 48 days General
Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 12/06/1930 17/06/1930 6 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 23/06/1933 11/08/1933 50 days General
Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 22/04/1936 08/06/1936 48 days General
Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/06/1936 17/07/1936 39 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/01/1939 21/02/1939 41 days General  
Darlington Works 07/08/1940 28/09/1940 53 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 03/09/1941 11/10/1941 39 days General
Boiler number 2560 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 29/11/1944 06/01/1945 39 days General
Boiler number D1556 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 25/05/1946 07/06/1946 14 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 16/07/1947 06/09/1947 53 days General
Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1951 26/05/1951 34 days General
Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61425
 
Darlington Works 10/05/1954 05/06/1954 27 days General
Boiler number 24038 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 07/06/1954 10/06/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/06/1954 07/07/1954 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/08/1956 19/09/1956 36 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 08/07/1957 17/08/1957 41 days General
Boiler number 24028 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 19/03/1958 27/03/1958 9 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 30/03/1960 10/09/1960 165 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1921 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 930
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
15/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1924. Dep: 25/11/1924.    
26/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/05/1926. Dep: 16/06/1926.    
25/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1927. Dep: 09/12/1927.    
30/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1929. Dep: 15/08/1929.    
04/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1929. Dep: 22/11/1929.    
13/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1930. Dep: 29/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49)
   
12/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1930. Dep: 17/06/1930.    
30/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
23/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1933. Dep: 11/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49)
   
22/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1936. Dep: 08/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49)
   
09/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1936. Dep: 17/07/1936.    
12/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1939. Dep: 21/02/1939.    
07/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/08/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940.    
03/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2560 (Diagram 49)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
29/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1556 (Diagram 49)
   
25/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 07/06/1946.    
18/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1425    
16/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49)
   
28/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
23/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61425
   
10/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1954. Dep: 05/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24038 (Diagram 49A)
   
07/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1954. Dep: 10/06/1954.    
24/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1954. Dep: 07/07/1954.    
15/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1956. Dep: 19/09/1956.    
08/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1957. Dep: 17/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24028 (Diagram 49A)
   
19/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1958. Dep: 27/03/1958.    
14/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
30/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/03/1960. Dep: 10/09/1960.    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61425 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev