|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 15/09/1924 | 25/11/1924 | 72 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/05/1926 | 16/06/1926 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/08/1927 | 09/12/1927 | 107 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1929 | 15/08/1929 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/11/1929 | 22/11/1929 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/03/1930 | 29/04/1930 | 48 days | General | Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/06/1930 | 17/06/1930 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1933 | 11/08/1933 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1936 | 08/06/1936 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1936 | 17/07/1936 | 39 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1939 | 21/02/1939 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1940 | 28/09/1940 | 53 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1941 | 11/10/1941 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2560 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1944 | 06/01/1945 | 39 days | General | Boiler number D1556 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1946 | 07/06/1946 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/07/1947 | 06/09/1947 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1951 | 26/05/1951 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61425 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1954 | 05/06/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24038 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1954 | 10/06/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1954 | 07/07/1954 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1956 | 19/09/1956 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1957 | 17/08/1957 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 24028 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1958 | 27/03/1958 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1960 | 10/09/1960 | 165 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 930 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
15/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1924. Dep: 25/11/1924. | ||
26/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/05/1926. Dep: 16/06/1926. | ||
25/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1927. Dep: 09/12/1927. | ||
30/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1929. Dep: 15/08/1929. | ||
04/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1929. Dep: 22/11/1929. | ||
13/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1930. Dep: 29/04/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49) |
||
12/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1930. Dep: 17/06/1930. | ||
30/03/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
23/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1933. Dep: 11/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49) |
||
22/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1936. Dep: 08/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49) |
||
09/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1936. Dep: 17/07/1936. | ||
12/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1939. Dep: 21/02/1939. | ||
07/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/08/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940. | ||
03/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2560 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
29/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1556 (Diagram 49) |
||
25/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 07/06/1946. | ||
18/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1425 | ||
16/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
03/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
23/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24022 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61425 |
||
10/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1954. Dep: 05/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24038 (Diagram 49A) |
||
07/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1954. Dep: 10/06/1954. | ||
24/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1954. Dep: 07/07/1954. | ||
15/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1956. Dep: 19/09/1956. | ||
08/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1957. Dep: 17/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24028 (Diagram 49A) |
||
19/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1958. Dep: 27/03/1958. | ||
14/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
30/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/03/1960. Dep: 10/09/1960. | ||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61425 from York (North) (50A) | ||
11/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |