|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 26/08/1924 | 29/11/1924 | 96 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1927 | 20/09/1927 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1928 | 31/05/1928 | 76 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1928 | 09/11/1928 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1932 | 05/07/1932 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1934 | 14/01/1935 | 63 days | General | Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1937 | 08/12/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1938 | 08/07/1938 | 136 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1941 | 14/03/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3164 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1944 | 12/08/1944 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3163 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3440 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1951 | 24/02/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24007 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61426 |
||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1953 | 12/11/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24085 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1954 | 09/11/1954 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1956 | 08/06/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24010 (Diagram 49A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 931 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
26/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924. | ||
06/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1927. Dep: 20/09/1927. | ||
17/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1928. Dep: 31/05/1928. | ||
16/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1928. Dep: 09/11/1928. | ||
24/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1932. Dep: 05/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49) |
||
13/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1934. Dep: 14/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1937. Dep: 08/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/02/1938. Dep: 08/07/1938. | ||
31/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1941. Dep: 14/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3164 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3163 (Diagram 49A) |
||
13/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1426 | ||
15/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3440 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
30/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24007 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61426 |
||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
19/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1953. Dep: 12/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24085 (Diagram 49A) |
||
25/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1954. Dep: 09/11/1954. | ||
08/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1956. Dep: 08/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24010 (Diagram 49A) |
||
29/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61426 from York (North) (50A) | ||
10/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |