Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1106 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7496 Week
» 36994 Month
» 373840 Year
» 1595405 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 931 m/e 03/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1426   13/12/1946
British Railways 61426   24/02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 03/1921 to Neville Hill (NEV)
Withdrawal Tue 29/09/1959 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 10/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 11/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEV Neville Hill (New) m/e 03/1921
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
YK York (North) on 04/12/1949
50B Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50A York (North) on 21/10/1951
   Withdrawn on 29/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) w/e 27/10/1951
WDN   on 30/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1921 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1201)
05/07/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1551)
14/01/1935 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1525)
08/12/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1622)
14/03/1941 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3164)
12/08/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3163)
21/06/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3440)
24/02/1951 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24007)
12/11/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24085)
08/06/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24010)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 26/08/1924 29/11/1924 96 days General  
Darlington Works 06/09/1927 20/09/1927 15 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 17/03/1928 31/05/1928 76 days General  
Darlington Works 16/10/1928 09/11/1928 25 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 24/05/1932 05/07/1932 43 days General
Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 13/11/1934 14/01/1935 63 days General
Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 27/10/1937 08/12/1937 43 days General
Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 23/02/1938 08/07/1938 136 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 31/01/1941 14/03/1941 43 days General
Boiler number 3164 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 06/07/1944 12/08/1944 38 days General
Boiler number 3163 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 15/05/1947 21/06/1947 38 days General
Boiler number 3440 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 30/01/1951 24/02/1951 26 days General
Boiler number 24007 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61426
 
Darlington Works 19/10/1953 12/11/1953 25 days General
Boiler number 24085 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 25/10/1954 09/11/1954 16 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 08/05/1956 08/06/1956 32 days General
Boiler number 24010 (Diagram 49A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1921 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 931
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
26/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924.    
06/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1927. Dep: 20/09/1927.    
17/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1928. Dep: 31/05/1928.    
16/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1928. Dep: 09/11/1928.    
24/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1932. Dep: 05/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49)
   
13/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1934. Dep: 14/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49)
   
27/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1937. Dep: 08/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1622 (Diagram 49)
   
23/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/02/1938. Dep: 08/07/1938.    
31/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1941. Dep: 14/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3164 (Diagram 49A)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
06/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3163 (Diagram 49A)
   
13/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1426    
15/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3440 (Diagram 49A)
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
30/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24007 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61426
   
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
21/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
19/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1953. Dep: 12/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24085 (Diagram 49A)
   
25/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1954. Dep: 09/11/1954.    
08/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1956. Dep: 08/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24010 (Diagram 49A)
   
29/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61426 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev