Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 1229 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7618 Week
» 28060 Month
» 364906 Year
» 1586471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 934 m/e 04/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1429   15/12/1946
British Railways 61429   12/05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 04/1921 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off Neville Hill (55H)
Scrapping During 10/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 40 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 29/9/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) m/e 04/1921
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 30/03/1931
YK York (North) on 27/05/1939
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1921 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1214)
09/10/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1021)
10/08/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1138)
16/05/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1438)
10/10/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1573)
23/03/1945 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1566)
19/09/1947 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2880)
12/05/1951 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24019)
10/12/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24007)
26/10/1956 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24082)
06/05/1960 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24104)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 31/01/1923 09/02/1923 10 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 28/10/1924 29/01/1925 94 days General  
Darlington Works 10/08/1925 21/08/1925 12 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 13/07/1927 08/11/1927 119 days General  
Gateshead Works 14/12/1927 31/12/1927 18 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 16/11/1928 29/11/1928 14 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 18/12/1929 08/01/1930 22 days Special
Tender only
 
Darlington Works 31/07/1930 09/10/1930 71 days General
Boiler number D1021 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 20/06/1933 10/08/1933 52 days General
Boiler number D1138 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 24/03/1936 16/05/1936 54 days General
Boiler number D1438 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 19/05/1936 21/05/1936 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/05/1938 05/08/1938 81 days General  
Darlington Works 09/08/1938 11/08/1938 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/04/1939 31/08/1939 132 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 10/09/1941 10/10/1941 31 days General
Boiler number D1573 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 21/02/1945 23/03/1945 31 days General
Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 17/07/1945 18/07/1945 2 days Light Repair
Water scoop refitted
 
Darlington Works 05/07/1946 05/07/1946 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 16/08/1947 19/09/1947 35 days General
Boiler number 2880 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 06/10/1947 09/10/1947 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/04/1951 12/05/1951 26 days General
Boiler number 24019 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61429
 
Darlington Works 28/05/1951 16/06/1951 20 days Heavy Casual
New cylinders fitted
 
Darlington Works 10/11/1953 10/12/1953 31 days General
Boiler number 24007 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 24/09/1956 26/10/1956 33 days General
Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 14/03/1960 06/05/1960 54 days General
Boiler number 24104 (Diagram 49A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1959 Swindon Works (Scrapyard) Scrapyard1401/23/9/37/56/7/57, 2254, 2812/23/5/30/3, 4200/26/61, 4377, 4540/53/84, 5315/55/82/6/8/90, 5566, 5703/8/33/43, 5810, 6318/22/8/31/4/54, 6409/28, 6721/3/7/43, 7738. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1921 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 934
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
31/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/01/1923. Dep: 09/02/1923.    
28/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1924. Dep: 29/01/1925.    
10/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1925. Dep: 21/08/1925.    
13/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1927. Dep: 08/11/1927.    
14/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1927. Dep: 31/12/1927.    
16/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1928. Dep: 29/11/1928.    
18/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Special) - Arr: 18/12/1929. Dep: 08/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
31/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1930. Dep: 09/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1021 (Diagram 49)
   
30/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
20/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1933. Dep: 10/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1138 (Diagram 49)
   
24/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1438 (Diagram 49)
   
19/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1936. Dep: 21/05/1936.    
17/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1938. Dep: 05/08/1938.    
09/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1938. Dep: 11/08/1938.    
22/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 31/08/1939.    
27/05/1939 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
10/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1941. Dep: 10/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1573 (Diagram 49)
   
21/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1945. Dep: 23/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49)
   
17/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/07/1945. Dep: 18/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Water scoop refitted
   
05/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/07/1946. Dep: 05/07/1946.    
15/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1429    
16/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1947. Dep: 19/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2880 (Diagram 49)
   
06/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947.    
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
17/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1951. Dep: 12/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24019 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61429
   
28/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1951. Dep: 16/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
   
10/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1953. Dep: 10/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24007 (Diagram 49A)
   
24/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1956. Dep: 26/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24082 (Diagram 49)
   
14/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1960. Dep: 06/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24104 (Diagram 49A)
   
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61429 from Neville Hill (55H)    

prev prev