Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 166 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 166 Week
» 22672 Month
» 325862 Year
» 1547427 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 936 m/e 04/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1430   25/08/1946
British Railways 61430   03/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 04/1921 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Thu 01/10/1959 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 10/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 38 yrs, 6 mths , 0 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 3/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) m/e 04/1921
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 15/06/1928
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
SKN Stockton on 06/05/1946
YK York (North) on 27/07/1947
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
YK York (North) on 04/12/1949
   Withdrawn on 01/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YK York (North) on 27/07/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
WDN   on 01/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1921 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1218)
12/08/1927 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D962)
30/10/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2265)
20/01/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1588)
27/11/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1631)
17/02/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2558)
21/08/1942 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1513)
08/08/1945 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2266)
03/09/1948 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2783)
16/08/1952 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24041)
11/11/1954 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24032)
25/01/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24056)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 26/10/1923 23/01/1924 90 days General  
Darlington Works 30/04/1927 12/08/1927 105 days General
Boiler number D962 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 17/09/1930 30/10/1930 44 days General
Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 11/09/1931 09/10/1931 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 12/12/1933 20/01/1934 40 days General
Boiler number D1588 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 19/11/1934 03/01/1935 46 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 03/07/1935 16/10/1935 106 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 08/10/1936 27/11/1936 51 days General
Boiler number D1631 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 30/11/1936 29/12/1936 30 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/01/1940 17/02/1940 32 days General
Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 11/06/1940 19/06/1940 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/07/1942 21/08/1942 50 days General
Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 25/06/1945 08/08/1945 45 days General
Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 19/08/1946 06/09/1946 19 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1430
 
Darlington Works 20/03/1947 19/04/1947 31 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 05/08/1948 03/09/1948 30 days General
Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 61430
 
Darlington Works 02/07/1952 16/08/1952 46 days General
Boiler number 24041 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 14/10/1954 11/11/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 01/01/1957 25/01/1957 25 days General
Boiler number 24056 (Diagram 49A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1921 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 936
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
26/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1923. Dep: 23/01/1924.    
30/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 12/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D962 (Diagram 49)
   
15/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1930. Dep: 30/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2265 (Diagram 49)
   
11/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1931. Dep: 09/10/1931.    
12/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1933. Dep: 20/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1588 (Diagram 49)
   
19/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/11/1934. Dep: 03/01/1935.    
03/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/07/1935. Dep: 16/10/1935.    
08/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1936. Dep: 27/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1631 (Diagram 49)
   
30/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1936. Dep: 29/12/1936.    
17/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1940. Dep: 17/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49)
   
11/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1940. Dep: 19/06/1940.    
03/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1942. Dep: 21/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
25/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1945. Dep: 08/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49)
   
06/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
19/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1946. Dep: 06/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1430
   
20/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947.    
27/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
05/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1948. Dep: 03/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 61430
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
02/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24041 (Diagram 49A)
   
14/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1954. Dep: 11/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49)
   
01/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1957. Dep: 25/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24056 (Diagram 49A)
   
01/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61430 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev