Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 771 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4939 Week
» 20053 Month
» 323243 Year
» 1544808 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 937 m/e 05/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1431   30/06/1946
British Railways (Interim) E1431   13/02/1948
British Railways 61431   12/05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 05/1921 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 12/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 7/11/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) m/e 05/1921
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 30/03/1931
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
50A York (North) on 14/02/1960
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   m/e 30/04/1961
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1921 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1221)
18/11/1927 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1218)
18/03/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1502)
30/08/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1141)
20/08/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1438)
31/03/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1566)
19/12/1938 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1133)
14/06/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1634)
20/05/1944 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2263)
13/02/1948 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2268)
11/08/1951 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24025)
27/11/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24014)
05/12/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24087)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 15/09/1924 21/12/1924 98 days General  
Darlington Works 13/06/1927 18/11/1927 159 days General
Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 12/12/1928 21/12/1928 10 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 26/02/1929 18/03/1929 21 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 03/01/1930 08/01/1930 6 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 05/02/1930 18/03/1930 42 days General
Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 13/07/1932 30/08/1932 49 days General
Boiler number D1141 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 27/06/1934 20/08/1934 55 days General
Boiler number D1438 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/02/1936 31/03/1936 58 days General
Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 05/11/1938 19/12/1938 45 days General
Boiler number D1133 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 20/12/1938 04/01/1939 16 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/05/1941 14/06/1941 37 days General
Boiler number D1634 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 25/04/1944 20/05/1944 26 days General
Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 08/01/1948 13/02/1948 37 days General
Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1431
 
Darlington Works 24/02/1948 01/03/1948 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/04/1951 12/05/1951 20 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 61431
 
Darlington Works 28/06/1951 11/08/1951 45 days General
Boiler number 24025 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 31/10/1953 27/11/1953 28 days General
Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 05/01/1954 21/01/1954 17 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 08/11/1956 05/12/1956 28 days General
Boiler number 24087 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 30/08/1957 13/09/1957 15 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/05/1961 Swindon Works (Dump) Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1921 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 937
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
15/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1924. Dep: 21/12/1924.    
13/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1927. Dep: 18/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49)
   
12/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1928. Dep: 21/12/1928.    
26/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1929. Dep: 18/03/1929.    
03/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1930. Dep: 08/01/1930.    
05/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1930. Dep: 18/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49)
   
30/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
13/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1932. Dep: 30/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1141 (Diagram 49)
   
27/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1934. Dep: 20/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1438 (Diagram 49)
   
03/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1936. Dep: 31/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49)
   
05/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 19/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1133 (Diagram 49)
   
20/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1938. Dep: 04/01/1939.    
09/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1634 (Diagram 49)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
25/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49)
   
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1431    
08/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1948. Dep: 13/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1431
   
24/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1948. Dep: 01/03/1948.    
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
23/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/04/1951. Dep: 12/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61431
   
28/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24025 (Diagram 49)
   
31/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1953. Dep: 27/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A)
   
05/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1954. Dep: 21/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
08/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1956. Dep: 05/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24087 (Diagram 49A)
   
30/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1957. Dep: 13/09/1957.    
14/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61431 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev