|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 10/05/1924 | 18/07/1924 | 70 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1924 | 07/10/1924 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1927 | 10/11/1927 | 188 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1930 | 19/01/1931 | 67 days | General | Boiler number D1592 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1933 | 01/06/1933 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2267 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1935 | 19/11/1935 | 41 days | General | Boiler number D1499 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 60 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1940 | 03/08/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1941 | 07/02/1942 | 54 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1943 | 16/08/1943 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1944 | 10/05/1944 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1945 | 30/06/1945 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2728 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/03/1947 | 11/04/1947 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1948 | 10/12/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 61432 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1948 | 31/12/1948 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/08/1949 | 09/09/1949 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1951 | 12/01/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24043 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1954 | 05/06/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24016 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1954 | 11/06/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1957 | 02/11/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24102 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1957 | 05/11/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard, i Complete Locos) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 942 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
10/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1924. Dep: 18/07/1924. | ||
26/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1924. Dep: 07/10/1924. | ||
06/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
28/09/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
07/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1927. Dep: 10/11/1927. | ||
15/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
14/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1930. Dep: 19/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1592 (Diagram 49) |
||
24/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1933. Dep: 01/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2267 (Diagram 49) |
||
10/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1935. Dep: 19/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1499 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. | ||
30/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
05/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1940. Dep: 03/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49) |
||
16/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1941. Dep: 07/02/1942. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
08/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1943. Dep: 16/08/1943. | ||
03/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1944. Dep: 10/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/06/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945. | ||
07/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2728 (Diagram 49) |
||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1432 | ||
24/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/03/1947. Dep: 11/04/1947. | ||
31/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1948. Dep: 10/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 61432 |
||
20/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948. | ||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
18/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1949. Dep: 09/09/1949. | ||
11/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1951. Dep: 12/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24043 (Diagram 49) |
||
01/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1954. Dep: 05/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24016 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1954. Dep: 11/06/1954. | ||
01/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24102 (Diagram 49A) |
||
04/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 05/11/1957. | ||
03/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61432 from Neville Hill (55H) | ||
10/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |