|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 13/03/1924 | 03/06/1924 | 83 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/01/1927 | 13/04/1927 | 84 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/04/1927 | 02/05/1927 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/12/1929 | 31/01/1930 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D1015 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1932 | 07/09/1932 | 55 days | General | Boiler number D1012 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1935 | 07/05/1935 | 86 days | General | Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1937 | 19/10/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1938 | 20/09/1938 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1940 | 09/05/1940 | 24 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1941 | 04/06/1941 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1556 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1944 | 29/09/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2880 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1946 | 08/03/1946 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1947 | 14/08/1947 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2887 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1947 | 06/09/1947 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1951 | 16/08/1951 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24027 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61433 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1954 | 01/05/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24089 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1956 | 20/08/1956 | 48 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1959 | 30/11/1959 | 11 days | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1951 | Locomotives still not renumbered | Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). | SLS/195108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 943 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
13/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1924. Dep: 03/06/1924. | ||
07/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
20/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1927. Dep: 13/04/1927. | ||
29/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/04/1927. Dep: 02/05/1927. | ||
13/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1929. Dep: 31/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1015 (Diagram 49) |
||
15/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1932. Dep: 07/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1012 (Diagram 49) |
||
11/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1935. Dep: 07/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49) |
||
22/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
07/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1937. Dep: 19/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49) |
||
31/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1938. Dep: 20/09/1938. | ||
25/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
16/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/04/1940. Dep: 09/05/1940. | ||
05/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
02/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1941. Dep: 04/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1556 (Diagram 49) |
||
06/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1944. Dep: 29/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2880 (Diagram 49) |
||
14/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/02/1946. Dep: 08/03/1946. | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1433 | ||
28/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1947. Dep: 14/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2887 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947. | ||
28/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
03/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
02/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1951. Dep: 16/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24027 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61433 |
||
30/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24089 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/07/1956. Dep: 20/08/1956. | ||
23/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
20/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/11/1959. Dep: 30/11/1959. | ||
30/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61433 from York (North) (50A) | ||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |