|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/06/1925 | 30/09/1925 | 100 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1928 | 28/03/1928 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1929 | 07/01/1930 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1931 | 13/03/1931 | 52 days | General | Boiler number D1465 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1934 | 28/02/1934 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1577 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1936 | 22/05/1936 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1434 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1938 | 18/08/1938 | 65 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1939 | 17/02/1940 | 114 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/2 Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1940 | 24/02/1940 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1941 | 27/12/1941 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1941 | 10/01/1942 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1942 | 30/09/1942 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1944 | 26/07/1944 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3500 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1946 | 13/07/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3165 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/08/1947 | 30/08/1947 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1948 | 15/01/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3940 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61437 |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/03/1950 | 14/04/1950 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1951 | 08/12/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24038 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1952 | 10/04/1952 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1954 | 24/04/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24036 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1954 | 27/04/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1956 | 13/06/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 24088 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1958 | 11/09/1958 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1959 | 24/11/1959 | 93 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1961 | 19/08/1961 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/01/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2366 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1175 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
23/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1925. Dep: 30/09/1925. | ||
09/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1928. Dep: 28/03/1928. | ||
24/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/12/1929. Dep: 07/01/1930. | ||
21/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1931. Dep: 13/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1465 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1934. Dep: 28/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1577 (Diagram 49) |
||
16/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1936. Dep: 22/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1434 (Diagram 49) |
||
15/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1938. Dep: 18/08/1938. | ||
27/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1939. Dep: 17/02/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/2 Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) |
||
21/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/02/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940. | ||
19/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1941. Dep: 27/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) |
||
31/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942. | ||
16/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1942. Dep: 30/09/1942. | ||
19/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1944. Dep: 26/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3500 (Diagram 49A) |
||
15/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1946. Dep: 13/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3165 (Diagram 49A) |
||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1437 | ||
08/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947. | ||
11/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1948. Dep: 15/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3940 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61437 |
||
16/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/03/1950. Dep: 14/04/1950. | ||
12/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24038 (Diagram 49A) |
||
01/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/04/1952. Dep: 10/04/1952. | ||
24/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1954. Dep: 24/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24036 (Diagram 49A) |
||
26/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/04/1954. Dep: 27/04/1954. | ||
10/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1956. Dep: 13/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24088 (Diagram 49A) |
||
18/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1958. Dep: 11/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A) |
||
24/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/08/1959. Dep: 24/11/1959. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
05/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1961. Dep: 19/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61437 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
12/10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |