|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 08/06/1925 | 21/09/1925 | 106 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1928 | 11/05/1928 | 67 days | General | Boiler number D1125 (Diagram 49) Anti-vacuum valve fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1928 | 07/06/1928 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1931 | 07/08/1931 | 51 days | General | Standard buffers & hook Boiler number D1029 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1934 | 15/06/1934 | 53 days | General | Boiler number D1491 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1936 | 20/06/1936 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2560 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1938 | 24/01/1939 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1941 | 30/09/1941 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3164 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1944 | 16/10/1944 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1946 | 15/06/1946 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1947 | 28/03/1947 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3447 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/11/1948 | 07/12/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61441 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1950 | 23/05/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2878 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1950 | 02/06/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1952 | 12/02/1952 | 29 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1953 | 30/05/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1953 | 04/06/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1955 | 26/01/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1959 | 10/08/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1959 | 29/09/1959 | 5 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/03/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2370 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1179 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
08/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1925. Dep: 21/09/1925. | ||
06/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1928. Dep: 11/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1125 (Diagram 49) Anti-vacuum valve fitted |
||
21/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1928. Dep: 07/06/1928. | ||
18/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1931. Dep: 07/08/1931. Work undertaken: Standard buffers & hook Boiler number D1029 (Diagram 49) |
||
24/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1934. Dep: 15/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1491 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
12/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2560 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1938. Dep: 24/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1566 (Diagram 49) |
||
12/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1941. Dep: 30/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49) |
||
12/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3164 (Diagram 49A) |
||
14/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 16/10/1944. | ||
17/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946. | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1441 | ||
15/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 28/03/1947. | ||
08/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3447 (Diagram 49A) |
||
21/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/11/1948. Dep: 07/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61441 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
20/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1950. Dep: 23/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2878 (Diagram 49) |
||
30/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1950. Dep: 02/06/1950. | ||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
15/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1952. Dep: 12/02/1952. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
30/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1953. Dep: 04/06/1953. | ||
21/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1955. Dep: 26/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1959. Dep: 10/08/1959. | ||
25/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1959. Dep: 29/09/1959. | ||
27/10/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61441 from York (North) (50A) | ||
11/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |