Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 751 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4919 Week
» 20033 Month
» 323223 Year
» 1544788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2372 on 17/04/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1443   03/11/1946
British Railways 61443   05/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 17/04/1923 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 11/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 38 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 23/11/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 17/04/1923
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
YK York (North) on 04/12/1949
50B Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50A York (North) on 17/02/1952
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLB Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 20/11/1948
ALLOC WHL West Hartlepool w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
17/04/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1480)
23/06/1928 Anti-vacuum valve fitted
05/05/1931 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1535)
12/01/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2557)
12/01/1934 Cab side screens fitted
12/01/1934 Steam Brake fitted
20/01/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2718)
03/12/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2780)
01/07/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3483)
25/01/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3486)
06/05/1950 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2702)
08/08/1956 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24063)
28/08/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24015)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 29/06/1925 25/09/1925 89 days General
Shorter chimney fitted
 
Darlington Works 19/10/1925 02/11/1925 15 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 25/04/1928 23/06/1928 60 days General
Anti-vacuum valve fitted
 
Darlington Works 30/07/1929 09/08/1929 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 19/03/1931 05/05/1931 48 days General
Standard buffers & hook
Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 05/12/1933 12/01/1934 39 days General
Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 26/11/1935 20/01/1936 56 days General
Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 16/10/1936 13/11/1936 29 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/02/1938 19/04/1938 51 days General  
Darlington Works 20/04/1938 29/04/1938 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/12/1939 24/01/1940 50 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 09/10/1940 03/12/1940 56 days General
Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 31/01/1942 04/03/1942 33 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 06/06/1944 01/07/1944 26 days General
Boiler number 3483 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 14/12/1946 25/01/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 24072 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 08/02/1947 17/02/1947 10 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 07/09/1948 05/10/1948 29 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 61443
 
Darlington Works 01/04/1950 06/05/1950 36 days General
Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 08/05/1950 11/05/1950 4 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 15/05/1952 28/05/1952 14 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 22/12/1953 11/02/1954 52 days General  
Darlington Works 20/06/1956 08/08/1956 50 days General
Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 07/05/1958 17/06/1958 42 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 27/07/1959 28/08/1959 33 days General
Boiler number 24015 (Diagram 49A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1951 Locomotives still not renumbered Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). SLS/195108
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/04/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2372
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
29/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1925. Dep: 25/09/1925.
Work undertaken:
Shorter chimney fitted
   
19/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1925. Dep: 02/11/1925.    
25/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1928. Dep: 23/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Anti-vacuum valve fitted
   
30/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1929. Dep: 09/08/1929.    
19/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1931. Dep: 05/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Standard buffers & hook
Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49)
   
05/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1933. Dep: 12/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49)
Steam Brake fitted
   
26/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1935. Dep: 20/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49)
   
16/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1936. Dep: 13/11/1936.    
28/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1938. Dep: 19/04/1938.    
20/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1938. Dep: 29/04/1938.    
06/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/12/1939. Dep: 24/01/1940.    
09/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1940. Dep: 03/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49)
   
31/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/01/1942. Dep: 04/03/1942.    
06/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3483 (Diagram 49A)
   
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1443    
14/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24072 (Diagram 49A)
   
08/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 17/02/1947.    
07/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/09/1948. Dep: 05/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61443
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
01/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49)
   
08/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 11/05/1950.    
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
17/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
15/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1952. Dep: 28/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
22/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1953. Dep: 11/02/1954.    
20/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1956. Dep: 08/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49)
   
07/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1958. Dep: 17/06/1958.    
27/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1959. Dep: 28/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24015 (Diagram 49A)
   
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61443 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev