|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/08/1925 | 23/10/1925 | 82 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1925 | 23/11/1925 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1928 | 18/09/1928 | 77 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1931 | 06/07/1931 | 48 days | General | Standard buffers & hook Boiler number D1573 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1936 | 18/03/1936 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1938 | 18/10/1938 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1940 | 16/02/1940 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/10/1944 | 08/11/1944 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1945 | 15/05/1945 | 97 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3580 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1945 | 07/07/1945 | 10 days | Light Repair | Water scoop refitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1947 | 24/05/1947 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3589 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/06/1948 | 22/06/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61444 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1949 | 11/11/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1951 | 08/09/1951 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1953 | 11/01/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24018 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1956 | 21/03/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1958 | 04/07/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24070 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1959 | 10/04/1959 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1960 | 02/11/1960 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1961 | 14/10/1961 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24071 (Diagram 49A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/08/1961 | York South | York south shed is now used for storage only-on 26th August the following were noted-47239/48, 61418/9/44/67, 68677/87, 69003/8/16. | SLS/196110 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster MPD (36A) (Ex-Works on shed) | Ex-Works on shed: D5818/9 new, 43062, 60012/50/92, 61361, 63922, 62040; also 61444 ex-Darlington Works. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/05/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2373 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1182 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
03/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1925. Dep: 23/10/1925. | ||
11/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/11/1925. Dep: 23/11/1925. | ||
04/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1928. Dep: 18/09/1928. | ||
20/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1931. Dep: 06/07/1931. Work undertaken: Standard buffers & hook Boiler number D1573 (Diagram 49) |
||
08/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1936. Dep: 18/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
05/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1938. Dep: 18/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49) |
||
02/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1940. Dep: 16/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A) |
||
27/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A) |
||
17/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/10/1944. Dep: 08/11/1944. | ||
08/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1945. Dep: 15/05/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3580 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945. Work undertaken: Water scoop refitted |
||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1444 | ||
29/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3589 (Diagram 49A) |
||
13/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1948. Dep: 22/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61444 |
||
10/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1949. Dep: 11/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951. | ||
11/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1953. Dep: 11/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24018 (Diagram 49A) |
||
22/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1956. Dep: 21/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1958. Dep: 04/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24070 (Diagram 49A) |
||
20/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1959. Dep: 10/04/1959. | ||
11/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1960. Dep: 02/11/1960. | ||
20/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24071 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61444 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
28/09/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |