|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 20/04/1926 | 15/09/1926 | 149 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/02/1929 | 16/05/1929 | 79 days | General | Lift holes created |
||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1929 | 09/08/1929 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/10/1930 | 06/11/1930 | 17 days | Light Repair | After colliding with Q6 2295 at Borough Gardens |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/03/1932 | 06/04/1932 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1932 | 18/11/1932 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1934 | 22/02/1935 | 103 days | General | Boiler number D1496 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1937 | 15/03/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2879 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1938 | 01/12/1938 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1939 | 07/09/1939 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1939 | 11/09/1939 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1941 | 25/06/1941 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1942 | 14/09/1942 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 03/11/1944 | 17/11/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1946 | 23/02/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24086 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1947 | 19/09/1947 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/10/1948 | 27/10/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61446 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1949 | 20/12/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3500 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1951 | 04/07/1951 | 21 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1953 | 16/01/1954 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 24087 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1956 | 11/08/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1956 | 08/10/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24036 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1959 | 06/11/1959 | 4 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/05/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2375 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1184 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
20/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1926. Dep: 15/09/1926. | ||
27/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1929. Dep: 16/05/1929. Work undertaken: Lift holes created |
||
30/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1929. Dep: 09/08/1929. | ||
21/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1930. Dep: 06/11/1930. Work undertaken: After colliding with Q6 2295 at Borough Gardens |
||
30/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1932. Dep: 06/04/1932. | ||
06/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1932. Dep: 18/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
12/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1934. Dep: 22/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1496 (Diagram 49) |
||
16/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
01/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1937. Dep: 15/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2879 (Diagram 49) |
||
24/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1938. Dep: 01/12/1938. | ||
01/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1939. Dep: 07/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1939. Dep: 11/09/1939. | ||
18/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1941. Dep: 25/06/1941. | ||
13/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1942. Dep: 14/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
03/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/11/1944. Dep: 17/11/1944. | ||
26/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24086 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1446 | ||
29/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
27/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
22/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1947. Dep: 19/09/1947. | ||
11/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1948. Dep: 27/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61446 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
22/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1949. Dep: 20/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3500 (Diagram 49A) |
||
14/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1951. Dep: 04/07/1951. | ||
01/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24087 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956. | ||
07/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1956. Dep: 08/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24036 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1959. Dep: 06/11/1959. | ||
17/01/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61446 from Neville Hill (55H) | ||
04/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |