Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 783 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4951 Week
» 20065 Month
» 323255 Year
» 1544820 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2376 on 29/05/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1447   05/05/1946
British Railways (Interim) E1447   13/02/1948
British Railways 61447   03/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 29/05/1923 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off Mirfield (56D)
Scrapping During 11/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 38 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 8/11/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 29/05/1923
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
52B Heaton on 25/09/1955
50B Neville Hill on 10/06/1956
56D Mirfield on 11/12/1960
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
WDN   on 27/02/1951
WDN 50C Selby on 27/02/1951
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 56D Mirfield on 17/12/1960
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/05/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1499)
12/09/1928 Anti-vacuum valve fitted
16/08/1932 Steam Brake fitted
16/08/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1111)
25/10/1935 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2702)
27/04/1938 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2694)
14/12/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1628)
09/11/1946 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1665)
15/12/1949 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2694)
18/09/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24034)
21/02/1958 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24059)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 02/06/1923 06/06/1923 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/02/1926 17/12/1926 312 days General  
Darlington Works 04/07/1928 12/09/1928 71 days General
Anti-vacuum valve fitted
 
Darlington Works 01/11/1928 14/11/1928 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/06/1932 16/08/1932 57 days General
Boiler number D1111 (Diagram 49)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 20/09/1935 25/10/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 12/10/1936 18/12/1936 68 days Heavy
New cylinders
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1938 27/04/1938 57 days General
Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 23/10/1940 14/12/1940 53 days General
Boiler number D1628 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 01/09/1941 11/09/1941 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 26/07/1943 23/09/1943 60 days General  
Gateshead Works 05/01/1945 20/01/1945 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 28/07/1945 01/08/1945 5 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 09/10/1946 09/11/1946 32 days General
Boiler number D1665 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 26/01/1948 13/02/1948 19 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1447
 
Darlington Works 13/07/1948 03/09/1948 53 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 61447
 
Darlington Works 17/11/1949 15/12/1949 29 days General
Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/08/1951 01/09/1951 24 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 19/01/1953 11/02/1953 24 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 20/07/1954 18/09/1954 61 days G:
Boiler number 24034 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 20/09/1954 22/09/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 19/09/1955 02/12/1955 75 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 09/02/1956 04/04/1956 56 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 17/06/1957 22/06/1957 6 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 25/07/1957 07/08/1957 14 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 27/01/1958 21/02/1958 26 days General
Boiler number 24059 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 03/03/1958 14/03/1958 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/06/1958 02/07/1958 27 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/12/1960 Mirfield MPD From 17th Dec., six B16s have been allocated for freight duties, viz.' 61411-4/6/47;, during 1959, several were on loan to this shed while the 4 Mirfield B1s were in shops. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/05/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2376
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
02/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/06/1923. Dep: 06/06/1923.    
09/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1926. Dep: 17/12/1926.    
04/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1928. Dep: 12/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Anti-vacuum valve fitted
   
01/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1928. Dep: 14/11/1928.    
21/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1932. Dep: 16/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1111 (Diagram 49)
Steam Brake fitted
   
20/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1935. Dep: 25/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24061 (Diagram 49)
   
12/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/10/1936. Dep: 18/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
   
02/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1938. Dep: 27/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49)
   
23/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1628 (Diagram 49)
   
01/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1941. Dep: 11/09/1941.    
26/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1943. Dep: 23/09/1943.    
05/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/01/1945. Dep: 20/01/1945.    
28/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/07/1945. Dep: 01/08/1945.    
05/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1447    
09/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1665 (Diagram 49)
   
26/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/01/1948. Dep: 13/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1447
   
13/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1948. Dep: 03/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61447
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
17/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1949. Dep: 15/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49)
   
09/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951.    
19/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1953. Dep: 11/02/1953.    
20/07/1954 Works Visit      
20/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1954. Dep: 22/09/1954.    
19/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 02/12/1955.    
25/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
09/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1956. Dep: 04/04/1956.    
10/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
17/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/06/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957.    
25/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/07/1957. Dep: 07/08/1957.    
27/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1958. Dep: 21/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24059 (Diagram 49A)
   
03/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1958. Dep: 14/03/1958.    
06/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/06/1958. Dep: 02/07/1958.    
11/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61447 from Mirfield (56D)    

prev prev