|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 01/03/1926 | 30/07/1926 | 152 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1927 | 10/08/1927 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1927 | 14/09/1927 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1928 | 07/12/1928 | 61 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1929 | 28/10/1929 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1932 | 18/02/1932 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1935 | 05/04/1935 | 65 days | General | Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49) Cab side screens fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1937 | 22/10/1937 | 39 days | General | Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1940 | 22/05/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number D1631 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1940 | 10/06/1940 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1940 | 29/11/1940 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 45 days | General | Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1943 | 22/09/1943 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1944 | 06/09/1944 | 143 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3506 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1944 | 20/09/1944 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/11/1945 | 11/12/1945 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1945 | 02/02/1946 | 47 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1946 | 14/02/1947 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/04/1948 | 29/04/1948 | 19 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61449 |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1949 | 28/09/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3491 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1952 | 16/02/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24012 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1954 | 04/01/1954 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24053 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1954 | 22/06/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1954 | 06/07/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1956 | 30/07/1956 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 24018 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1956 | 09/08/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1958 | 03/09/1959 | 257 days | General | Boiler number 24081 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1959 | 24/09/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/06/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2378 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1187 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
01/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1926. Dep: 30/07/1926. | ||
14/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1927. Dep: 10/08/1927. | ||
05/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1927. Dep: 14/09/1927. | ||
08/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1928. Dep: 07/12/1928. | ||
16/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1929. Dep: 28/10/1929. | ||
13/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1932. Dep: 18/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
31/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1935. Dep: 05/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49) Cab side screens fitted |
||
14/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1937. Dep: 22/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49) |
||
24/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1940. Dep: 22/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1631 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1940. Dep: 10/06/1940. | ||
13/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1940. Dep: 29/11/1940. | ||
01/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49) |
||
15/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/09/1943. Dep: 22/09/1943. | ||
17/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1944. Dep: 06/09/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3506 (Diagram 49A) |
||
13/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1944. Dep: 20/09/1944. | ||
21/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/11/1945. Dep: 11/12/1945. | ||
18/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/12/1945. Dep: 02/02/1946. | ||
05/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1449 | ||
21/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 14/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1948. Dep: 29/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61449 |
||
02/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1949. Dep: 28/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3491 (Diagram 49A) |
||
17/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24012 (Diagram 49A) |
||
04/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 04/01/1954. Dep: 04/01/1954. | ||
22/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24053 (Diagram 49A) |
||
21/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1954. Dep: 22/06/1954. | ||
05/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1954. Dep: 06/07/1954. | ||
14/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1956. Dep: 30/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24018 (Diagram 49A) |
||
07/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1956. Dep: 09/08/1956. | ||
21/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1958. Dep: 03/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24081 (Diagram 49A) |
||
16/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1959. Dep: 24/09/1959. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
03/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61449 from Mirfield (56D) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |