Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 748 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4916 Week
» 20030 Month
» 323220 Year
» 1544785 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2379 on 30/06/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1450   18/12/1946
British Railways 61450   12/08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 30/06/1923 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 02/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 38 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 30/11/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) on 30/06/1923
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 30/03/1931
YK York (North) on 04/06/1939
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
YK York (North) on 04/12/1949
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/06/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1513)
27/05/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1634)
27/05/1933 Steam Brake fitted
27/05/1933 Cab side screens fitted
21/01/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1587)
11/02/1938 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1535)
26/11/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2692)
03/06/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3447)
16/07/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3163)
12/08/1950 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3269)
27/06/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24081)
17/05/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24015)
05/02/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24086)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 31/08/1926 21/01/1927 144 days General  
Darlington Works 21/06/1928 19/07/1928 29 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 08/08/1929 23/10/1929 77 days General
Plate position altered. Lifting holes put in
 
Darlington Works 26/11/1930 26/12/1930 31 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 19/03/1931 31/03/1931 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/04/1933 27/05/1933 34 days General
Boiler number D1634 (Diagram 49)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 28/11/1935 21/01/1936 55 days General
Boiler number D1587 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 16/11/1937 11/02/1938 88 days General
Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 14/02/1938 14/03/1938 29 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/10/1940 26/11/1940 28 days General
Boiler number 2692 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 12/11/1941 24/11/1941 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/05/1944 03/06/1944 32 days General
Boiler number 3447 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 20/06/1947 16/07/1947 27 days General
Boiler number 3163 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 26/06/1950 12/08/1950 48 days General
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61450
 
Darlington Works 09/10/1950 14/10/1950 6 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 03/06/1953 27/06/1953 25 days General
Boiler number 24081 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 27/09/1954 16/10/1954 20 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 17/04/1956 17/05/1956 31 days General
Boiler number 24015 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 02/01/1959 05/02/1959 35 days General
Boiler number 24086 (Diagram 49A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808
13/06/1959 Great Central Main Line The winter timetable is due to commence on 1st November but discontinuance of the daytime Manchester-Marylebone and South Yorkshireman trains has been postponed pending approval by the T.U.C.C. On Saturday, 22nd August, 'Hall' GWR6979 arrived at Sheffield Victoria hauling the 11-16 a.m. Bournemouth West - Newcastle on Tyne. (It was piloted by B16 61450 which had been attached at Armersley as 6979 was 'short of steam.'). Normally, GW locomotives haul these trains as far as Leicester but on this day, a derailment at Leicester GC disorganised workings donsiderably; 6979's train was over two hours late. SLS/195909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/06/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2379
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
31/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1926. Dep: 21/01/1927.    
21/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1928. Dep: 19/07/1928.    
08/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1929. Dep: 23/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Plate position altered. Lifting holes put in
   
26/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1930. Dep: 26/12/1930.    
19/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1931. Dep: 31/03/1931.    
30/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
24/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1933. Dep: 27/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1634 (Diagram 49)
Steam Brake fitted
   
28/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1935. Dep: 21/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1587 (Diagram 49)
   
16/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1937. Dep: 11/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49)
   
14/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1938. Dep: 14/03/1938.    
04/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
30/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1940. Dep: 26/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2692 (Diagram 49)
   
12/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1941. Dep: 24/11/1941.    
03/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3447 (Diagram 49A)
   
18/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1450    
20/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1947. Dep: 16/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3163 (Diagram 49A)
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
26/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1950. Dep: 12/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61450
   
09/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/10/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950.    
03/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1953. Dep: 27/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24081 (Diagram 49A)
   
27/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954.    
17/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1956. Dep: 17/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24015 (Diagram 49A)
   
02/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1959. Dep: 05/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24086 (Diagram 49A)
   
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61450 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev