Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 815 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4983 Week
» 20097 Month
» 323287 Year
» 1544852 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2380 on 31/07/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1451 on 17/02/1946
British Railways 61451   22/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 31/07/1923 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 11/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 38 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 23/11/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 31/07/1923
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 27/05/1929
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
YK York (North) on 04/12/1949
50B Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50E Scarborough on 04/11/1951
50A York (North) on 17/02/1952
52B Heaton on 20/11/1955
50A York (North) on 08/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ALN   w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50E Scarborough w/e 10/11/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
31/07/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1525)
29/10/1928 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1438)
16/11/1931 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1559)
04/06/1934 Cab side screens fitted
04/06/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1631)
21/10/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1480)
07/07/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1491)
13/06/1942 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2267)
09/02/1945 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2780)
05/12/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3263)
17/04/1951 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24020)
27/07/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24056)
07/12/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24007)
12/07/1960 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24080)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 26/10/1925 28/01/1926 95 days General  
Darlington Works 05/09/1928 29/10/1928 55 days General
Boiler number D1438 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 02/10/1931 16/11/1931 46 days General
Standard buffers & hook
Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 21/04/1934 04/06/1934 45 days General
Boiler number D1631 (Diagram 49)
Cab side screens fitted
 
Darlington Works 03/09/1936 21/10/1936 49 days General
Boiler number D1480 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 31/05/1939 07/07/1939 38 days General
Boiler number D1491 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 19/08/1940 19/09/1940 32 days Special
Tender only
 
Darlington Works 14/05/1942 13/06/1942 31 days General
Boiler number 2267 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 05/01/1945 09/02/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 16/08/1945 17/08/1945 2 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 22/05/1946 06/06/1946 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 30/10/1947 05/12/1947 37 days General
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 03/01/1949 22/01/1949 20 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 61451
 
Darlington Works 21/03/1951 17/04/1951 28 days General
Boiler number 24020 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 29/06/1951 07/07/1951 9 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 29/06/1954 27/07/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 24056 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 14/11/1956 07/12/1956 24 days General
Boiler number 24007 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 12/06/1957 12/06/1957 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 03/07/1957 10/07/1957 8 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 10/12/1958 13/01/1959 35 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 16/03/1960 12/07/1960 119 days General
Boiler number 24080 (Diagram 49A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/07/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2380
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
26/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1925. Dep: 28/01/1926.    
05/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1928. Dep: 29/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1438 (Diagram 49)
   
27/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
02/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1931. Dep: 16/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Standard buffers & hook
Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49)
   
21/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1934. Dep: 04/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1631 (Diagram 49)
Cab side screens fitted
   
03/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1936. Dep: 21/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1480 (Diagram 49)
   
31/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1939. Dep: 07/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1491 (Diagram 49)
   
19/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 19/08/1940. Dep: 19/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
14/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2267 (Diagram 49)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
05/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1945. Dep: 09/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2780 (Diagram 49)
   
16/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1945. Dep: 17/08/1945.    
17/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1451    
22/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/05/1946. Dep: 06/06/1946.    
30/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1947. Dep: 05/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 49A)
   
03/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61451
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
21/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1951. Dep: 17/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24020 (Diagram 49A)
   
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
29/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1951. Dep: 07/07/1951.    
04/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (50E)    
17/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
29/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1954. Dep: 27/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24056 (Diagram 49A)
   
20/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
14/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1956. Dep: 07/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24007 (Diagram 49A)
   
12/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 12/06/1957. Dep: 12/06/1957.    
03/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/07/1957. Dep: 10/07/1957.    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
10/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/12/1958. Dep: 13/01/1959.    
16/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1960. Dep: 12/07/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24080 (Diagram 49A)
   
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61451 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev