|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 08/03/1926 | 05/01/1927 | 304 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1928 | 01/12/1928 | 41 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/01/1929 | 07/03/1929 | 57 days | General | Small numberplate fitted to driving splashers Boiler number D983 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1933 | 07/02/1933 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1556 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1936 | 15/05/1936 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1938 | 11/11/1938 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1939 | 13/09/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3035 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1940 | 25/04/1940 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1942 | 14/01/1943 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3051 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1943 | 18/03/1943 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/12/1944 | 17/01/1945 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1946 | 22/08/1946 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3035 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1946 | 04/09/1946 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/11/1947 | 11/12/1947 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1949 | 26/11/1949 | 6 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 61452 |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1950 | 19/04/1950 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 3439 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1953 | 09/05/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24077 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1955 | 17/09/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24048 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1955 | 20/09/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1958 | 11/07/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24065 (Diagram 49) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/08/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2381 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1190 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
08/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1926. Dep: 05/01/1927. | ||
22/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/10/1928. Dep: 01/12/1928. | ||
10/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1929. Dep: 07/03/1929. Work undertaken: Small numberplate fitted to driving splashers Boiler number D983 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1933. Dep: 07/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1556 (Diagram 49) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
02/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1936. Dep: 15/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24063 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
29/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 11/11/1938. | ||
02/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1939. Dep: 13/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3035 (Diagram 49A) |
||
25/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 25/04/1940. Dep: 25/04/1940. | ||
15/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1942. Dep: 14/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3051 (Diagram 49A) |
||
04/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1943. Dep: 18/03/1943. | ||
16/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1944. Dep: 17/01/1945. | ||
17/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1452 | ||
02/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1946. Dep: 22/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3035 (Diagram 49A) |
||
29/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/08/1946. Dep: 04/09/1946. | ||
20/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1947. Dep: 11/12/1947. | ||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
21/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61452 |
||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
02/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1950. Dep: 19/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3439 (Diagram 49A) |
||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
08/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24077 (Diagram 49A) |
||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
14/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
10/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24048 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 20/09/1955. | ||
12/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1958. Dep: 11/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24065 (Diagram 49) |
||
18/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61452 from York (North) (50A) | ||
02/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |