Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 712 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4880 Week
» 19994 Month
» 323184 Year
» 1544749 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1377 on 10/11/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1460   10/11/1946
British Railways 61460   25/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 10/11/1923 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Fri 15/09/1961 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 02/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 37 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 8/10/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 10/11/1923
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
YK York (North) on 04/12/1949
50B Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50A York (North) on 17/02/1952
   Withdrawn on 15/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   on 15/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/11/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1573)
25/06/1931 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D980)
14/11/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2263)
04/08/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1502)
22/12/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1564)
27/02/1943 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3038)
22/05/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3265)
25/08/1949 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3947)
11/10/1952 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24024)
25/03/1955 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24033)
14/03/1958 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24067)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 27/01/1926 22/05/1926 116 days General  
Darlington Works 12/05/1928 18/07/1928 68 days General  
Darlington Works 18/08/1930 01/09/1930 15 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 04/02/1931 11/02/1931 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/05/1931 25/06/1931 50 days General
Boiler number D980 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 24/08/1932 07/09/1932 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/10/1933 14/11/1933 37 days General
Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1935 06/06/1935 45 days General  
Darlington Works 14/06/1937 04/08/1937 52 days General
Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 05/08/1937 25/08/1937 21 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/11/1939 22/12/1939 43 days General
Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 20/01/1943 27/02/1943 39 days General
Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 29/12/1944 14/01/1945 17 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 23/04/1946 22/05/1946 30 days General
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 25/08/1947 13/09/1947 20 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/07/1949 25/08/1949 44 days General
Boiler number 3947 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61460
 
Darlington Works 11/11/1949 19/11/1949 9 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 02/02/1951 15/02/1951 14 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 19/09/1952 11/10/1952 23 days General
Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 13/10/1952 24/10/1952 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/03/1955 25/03/1955 25 days General
Boiler number 24033 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 04/04/1955 14/04/1955 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 27/02/1956 21/03/1956 24 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/11/1956 22/11/1956 8 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 10/02/1958 14/03/1958 33 days General
Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 06/01/1959 30/01/1959 25 days Light Casual
After collision
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/11/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1377
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
27/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1926. Dep: 22/05/1926.    
12/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 18/07/1928.    
18/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1930. Dep: 01/09/1930.    
04/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1931. Dep: 11/02/1931.    
07/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1931. Dep: 25/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D980 (Diagram 49)
   
24/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/08/1932. Dep: 07/09/1932.    
09/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1933. Dep: 14/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49)
   
23/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1935. Dep: 06/06/1935.    
14/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1937. Dep: 04/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49)
   
05/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1937. Dep: 25/08/1937.    
10/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1939. Dep: 22/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49)
   
20/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 49A)
   
29/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1944. Dep: 14/01/1945.    
23/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1946. Dep: 22/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 49A)
   
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1460    
25/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1947. Dep: 13/09/1947.    
13/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1949. Dep: 25/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3947 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61460
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
11/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/11/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949.    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
02/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1951. Dep: 15/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
17/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
19/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1952. Dep: 11/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A)
   
13/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952.    
01/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1955. Dep: 25/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24033 (Diagram 49A)
   
04/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1955. Dep: 14/04/1955.    
27/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/02/1956. Dep: 21/03/1956.    
15/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1956. Dep: 22/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
10/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1958. Dep: 14/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A)
   
06/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1959. Dep: 30/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
15/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61460 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev