|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 17/09/1925 | 17/03/1926 | 182 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 01/09/1926 | 02/12/1926 | 93 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/08/1928 | 23/10/1928 | 62 days | General | Boiler number D1133 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1931 | 14/04/1931 | 56 days | General | Boiler number D1186 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1933 | 11/01/1934 | 64 days | General | Screw reverse ftted Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1937 | 16/04/1937 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24079 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1938 | 01/12/1938 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1939 | 29/11/1939 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2884 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1940 | 20/06/1940 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1942 | 28/04/1942 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2879 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2887 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1945 | 01/10/1945 | 1 day | Unclassified | Water scoop refitted |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/06/1946 | 28/06/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1947 | 07/06/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1947 | 26/06/1947 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1947 | 13/08/1948 | 250 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3587 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61461 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1951 | 16/03/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24070 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1955 | 12/10/1955 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1957 | 10/01/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24005 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1958 | 03/02/1958 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1958 | 26/02/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1960 | 10/12/1960 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24105 (Diagram 49A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/11/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1378 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1214 Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
17/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1925. Dep: 17/03/1926. | ||
01/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/09/1926. Dep: 02/12/1926. | ||
23/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1928. Dep: 23/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1133 (Diagram 49) |
||
09/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
18/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1931. Dep: 14/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1186 (Diagram 49) |
||
09/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1933. Dep: 11/01/1934. Work undertaken: Screw reverse ftted Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49) |
||
09/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1937. Dep: 16/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24079 (Diagram 49) |
||
18/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/11/1938. Dep: 01/12/1938. | ||
02/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1939. Dep: 29/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2884 (Diagram 49) |
||
12/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/06/1940. Dep: 20/06/1940. | ||
27/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1942. Dep: 28/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2879 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
18/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2887 (Diagram 49) |
||
01/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1945. Dep: 01/10/1945. Work undertaken: Water scoop refitted |
||
13/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1946. Dep: 28/06/1946. | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1461 | ||
03/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 07/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2783 (Diagram 49) |
||
10/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1947. Dep: 26/06/1947. | ||
08/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1947. Dep: 13/08/1948. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3587 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61461 |
||
15/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1951. Dep: 16/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24009 (Diagram 49A) |
||
15/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24017 (Diagram 49A) |
||
09/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24070 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 12/10/1955. | ||
09/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1957. Dep: 10/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24005 (Diagram 49A) |
||
22/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1958. Dep: 03/02/1958. | ||
20/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/02/1958. Dep: 26/02/1958. | ||
08/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1960. Dep: 10/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24105 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
16/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61461 from Mirfield (56D) | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |