Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 562 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 562 Week
» 30060 Month
» 366906 Year
» 1588471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1380 on 29/11/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1463   05/12/1946
British Railways 61463   26/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/129/11/1923
B16/321/11/1947
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 29/11/1923 to Neville Hill (NEV)
Withdrawal Mon 29/06/1964 off Hull Dairycoates (50B)
Scrapping Mon 21/09/1964 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 40 yrs , 7 mths

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A. Draper, Hull, 9/64. Cut up 21/9/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEV Neville Hill (New) on 29/11/1923
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
50B Hull Dairycoates on 02/12/1962
   Withdrawn on 29/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/12/1962
WDN   on 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/11/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1583)
09/03/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1535)
30/12/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1592)
12/08/1940 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3052)
19/10/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3051)
02/11/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3577)
26/05/1950 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3585)
04/10/1952 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24064)
20/11/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24059)
09/02/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24037)
18/06/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24021)
18/12/1962 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24002)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 09/01/1924 30/01/1924 22 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 28/03/1924 09/04/1924 13 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 17/09/1926 28/12/1926 103 days General  
Darlington Works 25/03/1930 23/06/1930 91 days General  
Darlington Works 06/02/1934 09/03/1934 32 days General
Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 10/11/1937 30/12/1937 51 days General
Boiler number D1592 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/07/1940 12/08/1940 35 days General
Boiler number 3052 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 24/08/1943 07/10/1943 45 days General  
Gateshead Works 12/01/1945 30/01/1945 19 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 20/09/1946 19/10/1946 30 days General
Boiler number 3051 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 21/08/1947 24/09/1947 35 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 11/10/1947 21/11/1947 42 days General
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3577 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 01/12/1947 04/12/1947 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/05/1950 26/05/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 3585 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61463
 
Darlington Works 31/05/1950 03/06/1950 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/09/1952 04/10/1952 23 days General
Boiler number 24064 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 06/10/1952 08/10/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/10/1954 20/11/1954 27 days General
Boiler number 24059 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 15/01/1957 09/02/1957 26 days General
Boiler number 24037 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 19/05/1959 18/06/1959 31 days General
Boiler number 24021 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 26/06/1959 06/07/1959 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 27/06/1960 05/07/1960 9 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 25/01/1961 09/03/1961 44 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 19/05/1961 01/06/1961 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/11/1962 18/12/1962 33 days General
Boiler number 24002 (Diagram 49A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/11/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1380
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
09/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/01/1924. Dep: 30/01/1924.    
28/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/03/1924. Dep: 09/04/1924.    
17/09/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1926. Dep: 28/12/1926.    
25/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1930. Dep: 23/06/1930.    
06/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1934. Dep: 09/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49)
   
10/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1937. Dep: 30/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1592 (Diagram 49)
   
09/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1940. Dep: 12/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3052 (Diagram 49A)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
24/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1943. Dep: 07/10/1943.    
12/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1945. Dep: 30/01/1945.    
20/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3051 (Diagram 49A)
   
05/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1463    
21/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1947. Dep: 24/09/1947.    
11/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1947. Dep: 21/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3577 (Diagram 49A)
   
01/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1947. Dep: 04/12/1947.    
01/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1950. Dep: 26/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3585 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61463
   
31/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1950. Dep: 03/06/1950.    
12/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24064 (Diagram 49A)
   
06/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1952. Dep: 08/10/1952.    
25/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24059 (Diagram 49A)
   
15/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24037 (Diagram 49A)
   
19/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1959. Dep: 18/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24021 (Diagram 49A)
   
26/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1959. Dep: 06/07/1959.    
27/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/06/1960. Dep: 05/07/1960.    
25/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1961. Dep: 09/03/1961.    
19/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1961. Dep: 01/06/1961.    
16/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1962. Dep: 18/12/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24002 (Diagram 49A)
   
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
29/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61463 from Hull Dairycoates (50B)    

prev prev