Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 189 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 22695 Month
» 325885 Year
» 1547450 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1381 on 04/12/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1464   11/01/1947
British Railways 61464   11/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 04/12/1923 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Mon 16/09/1963 off Mirfield (56D)
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 39 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 2/12/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) on 04/12/1923
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
56D Mirfield on 10/09/1961
   Withdrawn on 16/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 3w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   on 16/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/12/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1587)
11/12/1929 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1012)
25/08/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1201)
18/10/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1141)
24/12/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2265)
10/08/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1480)
27/12/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1559)
04/04/1945 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3491)
22/11/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3495)
12/11/1949 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3977)
15/03/1952 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24053)
20/05/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24050)
22/08/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24081)
08/01/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24029)
06/07/1961 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24108)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/06/1961 Darlington Works (Outside Stripping Shop) Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. SLS/196107
09/07/1961 Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) Waiting Works: D237, 60814, 61020, 63448, 67731/69, 78015, 90415. Ex-Works: 60872, 60928/42, 61273, 61303, 61448/64, 65801/93, 67636/90, 80099, 80100, 90465, 90710, 92147/92. SLS/196108
26/08/1961 York North MPD (50A) At North shed 61448/64 were in steam ex-works, repainted and lined out. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/12/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1381
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
11/12/1929 Modification Diagram 49 number D1012 boiler fitted    
25/08/1932 Modification Diagram 49 number D1201 boiler fitted    
18/10/1934 Modification Diagram 49 number D1141 boiler fitted    
24/12/1936 Modification Diagram 49 number 2265 boiler fitted    
10/08/1939 Modification Diagram 49 number D1480 boiler fitted    
27/12/1941 Modification Diagram 49 number D1559 boiler fitted    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
04/04/1945 Modification Diagram 49A number 3491 boiler fitted    
22/11/1946 Modification Diagram 49A number 3495 boiler fitted    
11/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1464    
11/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61464    
12/11/1949 Modification Diagram 49A number 3977 boiler fitted    
15/03/1952 Modification Diagram 49A number 24053 boiler fitted    
20/05/1954 Modification Diagram 49A number 24050 boiler fitted    
22/08/1956 Modification Diagram 49A number 24081 boiler fitted    
08/01/1959 Modification Diagram 49A number 24029 boiler fitted    
08/01/1959 Modification Diagram 49A number 3505 boiler fitted    
06/07/1961 Modification Diagram 49A number 24108 boiler fitted    
10/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
16/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 61464 from Mirfield (56D)    

prev prev