Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1287 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7676 Week
» 28118 Month
» 364964 Year
» 1586529 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1382 on 13/12/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1465   24/11/1946
British Railways 61465   26/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 13/12/1923 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Mon 25/01/1960 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 01/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 36 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) on 13/12/1923
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 29/08/1941
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
YK York (North) on 04/12/1949
50B Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50A York (North) on 15/11/1953
50B Neville Hill on 14/03/1954
50A York (North) on 18/07/1954
   Withdrawn on 25/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 14/08/1954
WDN   w/e 25/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
13/12/1923 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1588)
26/02/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1614)
27/07/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1172)
16/01/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1221)
28/12/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2694)
15/01/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3434)
06/10/1951 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24030)
28/02/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24014)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 14/05/1924 21/05/1924 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/12/1926 22/04/1927 116 days General  
Darlington Works 13/01/1930 26/02/1930 45 days General
Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 30/09/1931 14/10/1931 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/06/1933 27/07/1933 50 days General
Boiler number D1172 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 21/11/1935 16/01/1936 57 days General
Boiler number D1221 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 05/11/1936 05/11/1936 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 25/11/1936 21/12/1936 27 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/12/1937 22/04/1938 131 days General  
Darlington Works 26/11/1940 28/12/1940 33 days General
Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 13/12/1943 15/01/1944 34 days General
Boiler number 3434 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 17/07/1945 19/07/1945 3 days Light Repair
Water scoop refitted
 
Gateshead Works 06/09/1945 26/09/1945 21 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 10/01/1946 02/02/1946 24 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 16/01/1947 22/03/1947 66 days General  
Gateshead Works 16/11/1948 26/11/1948 11 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 61465
 
Darlington Works 06/09/1951 06/10/1951 31 days General
Boiler number 24030 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 08/10/1951 13/10/1951 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/12/1953 01/12/1953 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 09/08/1954 09/10/1954 62 days General  
Darlington Works 30/01/1957 28/02/1957 30 days General
Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 17/08/1959 18/08/1959 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/10/1959 17/10/1959 12 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 20/01/1960 20/01/1960 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/12/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1382
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
14/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1924. Dep: 21/05/1924.    
28/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1926. Dep: 22/04/1927.    
13/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1930. Dep: 26/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49)
   
30/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/09/1931. Dep: 14/10/1931.    
08/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1933. Dep: 27/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1172 (Diagram 49)
   
21/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1935. Dep: 16/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1221 (Diagram 49)
   
05/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/11/1936. Dep: 05/11/1936.    
25/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1936. Dep: 21/12/1936.    
13/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1937. Dep: 22/04/1938.    
26/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49)
   
29/08/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
13/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3434 (Diagram 49A)
   
17/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/07/1945. Dep: 19/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Water scoop refitted
   
06/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1945. Dep: 26/09/1945.    
10/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1946. Dep: 02/02/1946.    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1465    
16/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947.    
16/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1948. Dep: 26/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 61465
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
06/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24030 (Diagram 49)
   
08/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951.    
15/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
01/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 01/12/1953.    
14/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
18/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
09/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954.    
30/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1957. Dep: 28/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A)
   
17/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1959. Dep: 18/08/1959.    
06/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1959. Dep: 17/10/1959.    
20/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/01/1960. Dep: 20/01/1960.    
25/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61465 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev