|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/05/1924 | 21/05/1924 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1926 | 22/04/1927 | 116 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1930 | 26/02/1930 | 45 days | General | Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1931 | 14/10/1931 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1933 | 27/07/1933 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D1172 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1935 | 16/01/1936 | 57 days | General | Boiler number D1221 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1936 | 05/11/1936 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1936 | 21/12/1936 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1937 | 22/04/1938 | 131 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1940 | 28/12/1940 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1943 | 15/01/1944 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3434 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/07/1945 | 19/07/1945 | 3 days | Light Repair | Water scoop refitted |
||
Gateshead Works | 06/09/1945 | 26/09/1945 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1946 | 02/02/1946 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 66 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/11/1948 | 26/11/1948 | 11 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61465 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24030 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1951 | 13/10/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1953 | 01/12/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1954 | 09/10/1954 | 62 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1957 | 28/02/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1959 | 18/08/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1959 | 17/10/1959 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1960 | 20/01/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/12/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1382 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1218 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
14/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1924. Dep: 21/05/1924. | ||
28/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1926. Dep: 22/04/1927. | ||
13/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1930. Dep: 26/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49) |
||
30/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/09/1931. Dep: 14/10/1931. | ||
08/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1933. Dep: 27/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1172 (Diagram 49) |
||
21/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1935. Dep: 16/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1221 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/11/1936. Dep: 05/11/1936. | ||
25/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1936. Dep: 21/12/1936. | ||
13/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1937. Dep: 22/04/1938. | ||
26/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24032 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/08/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
13/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3434 (Diagram 49A) |
||
17/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/07/1945. Dep: 19/07/1945. Work undertaken: Water scoop refitted |
||
06/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1945. Dep: 26/09/1945. | ||
10/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1946. Dep: 02/02/1946. | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1465 | ||
16/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. | ||
16/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1948. Dep: 26/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61465 |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
06/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24030 (Diagram 49) |
||
08/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951. | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
01/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 01/12/1953. | ||
14/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
18/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
09/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954. | ||
30/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1957. Dep: 28/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A) |
||
17/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1959. Dep: 18/08/1959. | ||
06/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1959. Dep: 17/10/1959. | ||
20/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/01/1960. Dep: 20/01/1960. | ||
25/01/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61465 from York (North) (50A) | ||
01/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |