|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/04/1927 | 29/07/1927 | 98 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1930 | 10/12/1930 | 58 days | General | Boiler number D1048 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1932 | 03/11/1932 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1933 | 25/09/1933 | 39 days | General | Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1936 | 02/05/1936 | 110 days | General | Boiler number D1573 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1939 | 09/06/1939 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D1623 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1939 | 22/06/1939 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1942 | 06/07/1942 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1944 | 27/10/1944 | 64 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/01/1946 | 29/01/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3491 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/01/1948 | 11/02/1948 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1467 |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1949 | 19/03/1949 | 24 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61467 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1949 | 11/08/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3966 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1952 | 01/03/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24050 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1952 | 05/03/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1954 | 08/05/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24037 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1954 | 13/05/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1956 | 14/08/1956 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1958 | 24/03/1958 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1958 | 29/07/1958 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 24074 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1960 | 19/09/1960 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1961 | 27/10/1961 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1955 | North Eastern Miscellany | Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. | SLS/195512 |
26/08/1961 | York South | York south shed is now used for storage only-on 26th August the following were noted-47239/48, 61418/9/44/67, 68677/87, 69003/8/16. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1384 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1220 Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
08/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
07/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
23/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1927. Dep: 29/07/1927. | ||
14/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1930. Dep: 10/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1048 (Diagram 49) |
||
12/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1932. Dep: 03/11/1932. | ||
18/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1933. Dep: 25/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49) |
||
14/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1573 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1939. Dep: 09/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1623 (Diagram 49) |
||
10/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1939. Dep: 22/06/1939. | ||
06/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1942. Dep: 06/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
25/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1944. Dep: 27/10/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
14/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1946. Dep: 29/01/1946. | ||
09/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1467 | ||
20/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3491 (Diagram 49A) |
||
21/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1948. Dep: 11/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1467 |
||
24/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61467 |
||
01/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1949. Dep: 11/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3966 (Diagram 49A) |
||
01/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1952. Dep: 01/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24050 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1952. Dep: 05/03/1952. | ||
07/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1954. Dep: 08/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24037 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1954. Dep: 13/05/1954. | ||
28/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1956. Dep: 14/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24029 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/03/1958. Dep: 24/03/1958. | ||
06/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1958. Dep: 29/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24074 (Diagram 49A) |
||
19/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 19/09/1960. Dep: 19/09/1960. | ||
28/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1961. Dep: 27/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
08/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61467 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
26/10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |