|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/12/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2800, name: SANDRINGHAM Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23803 |
||
07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1600 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61600 | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) | ||
10/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
14/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
19/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
20/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
28/07/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61600 | ||
08/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |