Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2800   07/12/1928
LNER (1946) 1600 m/e 07/1946
BR 61600 m/e 05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/12/1928 SANDRINGHAM

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/107/12/1928
B17/606/1950
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23803
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 07/12/1928
Withdrawal Mon 28/07/1958
Scrapping During 08/1958
Service Life 29 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IPS Ipswich 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 4w/e 14/02/1953
31A Cambridge 5w/e 19/01/1957
30A Stratford 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn 28/07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/12/1928 To Service To service as LNER Number 2800, name: SANDRINGHAM
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23803
   
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1600    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61600    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
28/07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61600    

prev