Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 182 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4694 Week
» 27200 Month
» 330390 Year
» 1551955 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2801 on 05/12/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1601 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 61601 m/e 12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/12/1928 HOLKHAM

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23804
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 05/12/1928
Withdrawal Mon 13/01/1958
Scrapping During 01/1958
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 05/12/1928
IPS Ipswich on 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 14/02/1953
31A Cambridge 5w/e 19/01/1957
30A Stratford 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn on 13/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   on 13/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1947 Hitchin MPD A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Hitchin, 'Cl' 2801/41/59 and 'J3' 4138. SLS/194710
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/12/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2801, name: HOLKHAM
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23804
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1601    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61601    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61601    

prev prev