Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18839 Week
» 71855 Month
» 191382 Year
» 3218235 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2802 |
m/e |
11/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1602 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61602 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Works Number |
23805 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 11/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 13/01/1958 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2802, name: WALSINGHAM Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23805 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1602 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61602 |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
01/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
13/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61602 |
|
|