Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 232 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 232 Week
» 30522 Month
» 333712 Year
» 1555277 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2803 on 13/12/1928
British Railways 61603 4w/e 22/01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/12/1928 FRAMLINGHAM

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/113/12/1928
B210/1946
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23806
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 13/12/1928
Withdrawal Mon 08/09/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 29 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 13/12/1928
COL Colchester on 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn on 08/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IPS Ipswich m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   on 08/09/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/12/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2803, name: FRAMLINGHAM
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23806
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
22/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61603    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
08/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61603    

prev prev