Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2803   13/12/1928
BR 61603 4w/e 22/01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/12/1928 FRAMLINGHAM

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/113/12/1928
B210/1946
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23806
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 13/12/1928
Withdrawal Mon 08/09/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 29 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
COL Colchester 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn 08/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/12/1928 To Service To service as LNER Number 2803, name: FRAMLINGHAM
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23806
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61603    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
08/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61603    

prev prev