Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 182 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2521 Week
» 8655 Month
» 236539 Year
» 1458104 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2804 on 13/12/1928
LNER (1946) 1604 m/e 03/1946
BR 61604 m/e 06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/12/1928 ELVEDEN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/113/12/1928
B17/611/1951
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23807
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 13/12/1928
Withdrawal Mon 24/08/1953
Scrapping During 08/1953
Service Life 24 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 13/12/1928
IPS Ipswich 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/07/1952
   Withdrawn 24/08/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IPS Ipswich m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 12/07/1952
WDN   w/e 24/08/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/12/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2804, name: ELVEDEN
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23807
   
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1604    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61604    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/08/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 61604    

prev prev