Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2805   17/12/1928
LNER (1946) 1605 m/e 08/1946
BR 61605 m/e 04/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
17/12/1928 LINCOLNSHIRE REGIMENT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/117/12/1928
B17/601/1948
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23808
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 17/12/1928
Withdrawal Thu 15/05/1958
Scrapping During 05/1958
Service Life 29 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 22/03/1952
30A Stratford 4w/e 20/09/1952
   Withdrawn 15/05/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/12/1928 To Service To service as LNER Number 2805, name: LINCOLNSHIRE REGIMENT
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23808
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1605    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61605    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/05/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61605    

prev prev