Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 401 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6377 Week
» 12511 Month
» 240395 Year
» 1461960 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2806 on 19/12/1928
LNER (1946) 1606 m/e 09/1946
BR 61606 m/e 03/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
19/12/1928 AUDLEY END

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/119/12/1928
B17/603/1950
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23809
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 19/12/1928
Withdrawal Mon 01/09/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 29 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 19/12/1928
STR Stratford 01/01/1948
30E Colchester 4w/e 17/11/1956
30A Stratford 5w/e 19/01/1957
30E Colchester 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn 01/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   01/09/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 Special Trains Two private specials from King's Cross to Clacton last spring went by way of the connecting link between the Enfield-Hertford line at Bounds Green Box and the Palace Gates branch, reaching the main line at Stratford. The first train consisted of eleven Pullmans hauled by.'N.2' Nos. 69576 an 69589 through Wood Green and over the flying junction to Bounds Green, near Bowes Park station: 'B.1' Nos. 61361 an 61363 then took over at the other end for the main journey. The second special was formed of eight coaches including two dining-cars: it was brought out from King's Cross by 'N.2' No. 9495, and taken forward similarly over the unusual route by 'B.17' No. 61606 Audley End. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/12/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2806, name: AUDLEY END
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23809
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1606    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61606    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
01/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61606    

prev prev