Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 123 Today
» 1336 Yesterday
» 3896 Week
» 3896 Month
» 193031 Year
» 1414596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2807   21/12/1928
LNER (1946) 1607 m/e 12/1946
BR 61607 w/e 30/07/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
21/12/1928 BLICKLING

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/121/12/1928
B205/1947
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23810
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 21/12/1928
Withdrawal Thu 14/01/1960
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 31 yrs , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 21/12/1928
COL Colchester 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 14/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/12/1928 To Service To service as LNER Number 2807, name: BLICKLING
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23810
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1607    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61607    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61607    

prev prev