Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 632 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3277 Week
» 5859 Month
» 270492 Year
» 1492057 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2807 on 21/12/1928
LNER (1946) 1607 m/e 12/1946
BR 61607 w/e 30/07/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
21/12/1928 BLICKLING

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/121/12/1928
B205/1947
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23810
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 21/12/1928
Withdrawal Thu 14/01/1960
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 31 yrs , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 21/12/1928
COL Colchester 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 14/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester 07/06/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   14/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1947 General The 2.5 p.m. Darlington to Leeds train (return from Leeds at 6.45 p.m.) continues as a running-in train for locos. ex-North Road Works. Since the appearance of 'V2' No. 836 (HAY) on 1/4, the consecutive appearance of new 'Bl' on this turn has been broken; No. 836 having worked intermittently on the train up to 2/6-an unusually long running-in period for Scottish Area 'V2,' which usually work this train only once or twice. The latest 'Bl' noted are Nos. 1026 on 29/4, 1022 on 16/5, and 1028 on 28/5. Nos. 1024/7 have not yet appeared on this turn. Two new conversions are No. 1468 to 'B16/3' and No. 1607 to 'B2,' and which first worked this train on 23/5 and 27/5 respectively. SLS/194708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/12/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2807, name: BLICKLING
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23810
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1607    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
30/07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61607    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61607    

prev prev