Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1173 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1173 Week
» 3755 Month
» 268388 Year
» 1489953 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2808 on 26/12/1928
LNER (1946) 1608 on 09/02/1946
BR 61608 m/e 05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
26/12/1928 GUNTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/126/12/1928
B17/610/1950
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23811
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 26/12/1928
Withdrawal Mon 14/03/1960
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 31 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 26/12/1928
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
30E Colchester 4w/e 17/11/1956
30A Stratford 5w/e 19/01/1957
30E Colchester 5w/e 14/06/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 20/12/1958
   Withdrawn 14/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge m/e 03/12/1945
WDN NWE New England 14/02/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 08/05/1948
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   14/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 Doncaster Works Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/12/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2808, name: GUNTON
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23811
   
09/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1608    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61608    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61608    

prev prev