Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2809   27/12/1928
LNER (1946) 1609 m/e 08/1946
BR 61609 m/e 03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
27/12/1928 QUIDENHAM

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/127/12/1928
B17/601/1952
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23812
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 27/12/1928
Withdrawal Mon 23/06/1958
Scrapping During 06/1958
Service Life 29 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
YAR Yarmouth South Town m/e 07/1949
30A Stratford 4w/e 14/02/1953
32B Ipswich 4w/e 10/05/1958
   Withdrawn 23/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/12/1928 To Service To service as LNER Number 2809, name: QUIDENHAM
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23812
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1609    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61609    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
23/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61609    

prev prev