Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 106 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2420 Week
» 13713 Month
» 278346 Year
» 1499911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2809 on 27/12/1928
LNER (1946) 1609 m/e 08/1946
BR 61609 m/e 03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
27/12/1928 QUIDENHAM

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/127/12/1928
B17/601/1952
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 23812
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 27/12/1928
Withdrawal Mon 23/06/1958
Scrapping During 06/1958
Service Life 29 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 27/12/1928
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
YAR Yarmouth South Town m/e 07/1949
30A Stratford 4w/e 14/02/1953
32B Ipswich 4w/e 10/05/1958
   Withdrawn on 23/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 17/05/1958
WDN   on 23/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/12/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2809, name: QUIDENHAM
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23812
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1609    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61609    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
23/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61609    

prev prev