Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 703 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 7066 Week
» 9648 Month
» 274281 Year
» 1495846 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2810 on 22/08/1930
LNER (1946) 1610 m/e 09/1946
BR 61610 m/e 05/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
22/08/1930 HONINGHAM HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/222/08/1930
B17/610/1953
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 22/08/1930
Withdrawal Mon 11/01/1960
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 29 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 22/08/1930
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
31B March 4w/e 10/05/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 12/12/1959
   Withdrawn 11/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 27/03/1948
WDN GRA Grantham 27/05/1949
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   11/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/08/1930 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2810, name: HONINGHAM HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1610    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61610    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
11/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61610    

prev prev