Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2810   22/08/1930
LNER (1946) 1610 m/e 09/1946
BR 61610 m/e 05/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
22/08/1930 HONINGHAM HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/222/08/1930
B17/610/1953
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 22/08/1930
Withdrawal Mon 11/01/1960
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 29 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 10/05/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 12/12/1959
   Withdrawn 11/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/08/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2810, name: HONINGHAM HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1610    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61610    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
11/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61610    

prev prev